EP0643084 - Process for producing multi-phase homo- or copolymers of C2-C10-alkenes in one reaction zone [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/11] | Process for producing multi-phase homo- or copolymers of C2-C10-alcenes in one reaction zone | ||
[1998/32] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.03.2000 [2000/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [1999/10] |
Former [1995/11] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seelert, Stefan, Dr. Mathäus-Merian-Ring 24a D-67227 Frankenthal / DE | 02 /
Langhauser, Franz, Dr. Salinenstrasse 103 D-67098 Bad Dürkheim / DE | 03 /
Kerth, Jürgen, Dr. Wattenheimer Strasse 15 D-67316 Carlsberg / DE | 04 /
Müller, Patrik, Dr. Johanniskreuzer Strasse 67 D-67661 Kaiserslautern / DE | 05 /
Fischer, David, Dr. Raiffeisenstrasse 1e D-67161 Gönnheim / DE | 06 /
Schweier, Günther, Dr. Friedrich-Pietzsch-Strasse 14 D-67159 Friedelsheim / DE | [1995/11] | Application number, filing date | 94113846.3 | 03.09.1994 | [1995/11] | Priority number, date | DE19934330667 | 10.09.1993 Original published format: DE 4330667 | [1995/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0643084 | Date: | 15.03.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0643084 | Date: | 26.04.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0643084 | Date: | 10.03.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C08F295/00, C08F4/622, C08F297/08, C08F10/00 | [1995/16] | CPC: |
C08F10/06 (EP,US);
C08F10/00 (EP,US);
C08F110/06 (EP,US);
C08F210/16 (EP,US);
C08F4/63904 (EP,US);
C08F4/63912 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F4/63904 (US,EP);
C08F10/00, C08F4/63927 (EP,US);
C08F110/06, C08F4/65904 (US,EP);
C08F210/16, C08F210/06 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [1995/11] | C08F295/00, C08F4/622 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1995/11] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von mehrphasigen Homo- oder Copolymerisaten von C2-C10-Alk-1-enen in einer Reaktionszone | [1995/11] | English: | Process for producing multi-phase homo- or copolymers of C2-C10-alkenes in one reaction zone | [1998/32] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'homo- ou compolymères multiphases d'alcènes en C2-C10 dans une zone réactionelle unique | [1995/11] |
Former [1995/11] | Process for producing multi-phase homo- or copolymers of C2-C10-alcenes in one reaction zone | Examination procedure | 21.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/20] | 10.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.09.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0516018 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [X] 1,3-6 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0536104 (FINA TECHNOLOGY [US]) [X] 1,2,4-6 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0439964 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-6 * page 6, line 18 - page 7, line 13 * * example -; claim - *; | [X]EP0232595 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4-6 * example -; claim - *; | [X]WO9215619 (PHILLIPS PETROLEUM CO [US]) [X] 1,2 * example -; claim - * |