EP0642888 - Sand-blasting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.11.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CONCHITA HOLDING S.A. 17, rue Nic Martha L-2133 Luxembourg / LU | [1995/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pizzinato, Dino F. 6, rue d'Oradour L-2226 Luxembourg / LU | [1995/11] | Representative(s) | Freylinger, Ernest T. Office Ernest T. Freylinger 234, route d'Arlon B.P. 48 8001 Strassen / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1995/11] | Freylinger, Ernest T. Office de Brevets Ernest T. Freylinger 321, route d'Arlon Boîte Postale 48 L-8001 Strassen / LU | Application number, filing date | 94113941.2 | 06.09.1994 | [1995/11] | Priority number, date | CH19930002650 | 07.09.1993 Original published format: CH 265093 | [1995/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0642888 | Date: | 15.03.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0642888 | Date: | 26.01.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B24C3/06, B24C9/00 | [1995/11] | CPC: |
B24C9/003 (EP);
B24C3/062 (EP);
B24C9/006 (EP);
Y02P70/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, PT, SE [1995/11] | Title | German: | Sandstrahlvorrichtung | [1995/11] | English: | Sand-blasting device | [1995/11] | French: | Dispositif de sablage | [1995/11] | Examination procedure | 10.08.1995 | Examination requested [1995/40] | 19.06.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.07.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 26.01.2000 | NL | 26.01.2000 | SE | 26.01.2000 | DK | 26.04.2000 | PT | 26.04.2000 | [2003/45] |
Former [2003/08] | ES | 26.01.2000 | |
NL | 26.01.2000 | ||
SE | 26.01.2000 | ||
PT | 26.04.2000 | ||
Former [2002/26] | ES | 26.01.2000 | |
SE | 26.01.2000 | ||
PT | 26.04.2000 | ||
Former [2002/23] | SE | 26.01.2000 | |
PT | 26.04.2000 | ||
Former [2001/09] | PT | 26.04.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]FR1414659 (THOMANN) [DY] 1,2,5-7 * page 1, column R, line 23 - line 40; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]FR2170430 (SHIGYO GENSHICHI [JP]) [Y] 1,2,5-7 * page 6, line 28 - page 7, line 5; figures 2-5 *; | [A]EP0010431 (VACU BLAST LTD [GB]) [A] 6-8 * abstract *; | [DA]FR2560262 (THOMANN CHANTAL [FR]) [DA] 1,12 * page 2, line 10 - page 3, line 25; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE3821739 (PLATE JOACHIM [DE]) [A] 9* abstract * |