EP0642730 - Mower with a housing open to the ground [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.2000 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.10.2000 [2000/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/17] | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, Illinois 61265-8098 / US | ||
Former [1995/11] | For all designated states DEERE & COMPANY 1 John Deere Road Moline, Illinois 61265 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuhn, John Boyd W1147 Filmore Road Rubicon, Wisconsin 53078 / US | 02 /
Kettler, Daniel James 1026 South Main Street Horicon, Wisconsin 53032 / US | 03 /
Stricker, David Keith W11879 Lange Road Columbus, Wisconsin 53925 / US | [1995/11] | Representative(s) | Feldmann, Bernhard, et al DEERE & COMPANY European Office Patent Department 68140 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/11] | Feldmann, Bernhard, et al DEERE & COMPANY European Office Patent Department D-68140 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 94113982.6 | 07.09.1994 | [1995/11] | Priority number, date | US19930121817 | 15.09.1993 Original published format: US 121817 | US19940212071 | 11.03.1994 Original published format: US 212071 | [1995/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0642730 | Date: | 15.03.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A01D34/00, A01D34/82 | [1995/11] | CPC: |
A01D34/005 (EP,US);
A01D34/826 (EP,US);
A01D2101/00 (EP,US);
Y10S56/17 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/11] | Title | German: | Mäher mit einem bodenwärts offenen Gehäuse | [1995/11] | English: | Mower with a housing open to the ground | [1995/11] | French: | Faucheuse à châssis ouvert vers le bas | [1995/11] | Examination procedure | 04.02.1995 | Examination requested [1995/14] | 26.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.03.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.04.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/42] | 11.05.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2000/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1999 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3091906 (HALL RUSSELL V); | [XA]DE2836525 (RAPID MASCH FAHRZEUGE AG) [X] 1-3 * page 8, line 9 - line 24; figure 1; claim 6 * * page 10, paragraph 1 * [A] 6; | [A]US4189903 (JACKSON HAROLD P [US], et al) [A] 4,5,7 * column 5, line 9 - column 7, line 60 *; | [A]GB2028625 (GEN ELECTRIC CANADA); | [A]US4205512 (THORUD RICHARD A [US]); | [A]US5129217 (LOEHR THOMAS J [US]) [A] 7,10 * column 2, line 34 - column 3, line 50 *; | [A]US5210998 (HOJO HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 7 * column 4, line 57 - column 5, line 45; figure 4 *; | [DPA]EP0580026 (DEERE & CO [US]) [DPA] 1,3 * column 9, line 9 - column 10, line 17; figures 8,9 * |