EP0642868 - Electroerosion machine with novel frame structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.05.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.07.1996 [1996/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHARMILLES TECHNOLOGIES S.A. 8-10, rue du Pré-de-la-Fontaine Zone industrielle de Satigny 1217 Meyrin 1 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1995/35] | For all designated states CHARMILLES TECHNOLOGIES S.A. 8-10, rue du Pré-de-la-Fontaine Zone industrielle de Satigny CH-1217 Meyrin 1 / CH | ||
Former [1995/11] | For all designated states CHARMILLES TECHNOLOGIES S.A. 8-10, rue du Pré-de-la-Fontaine Zone Ind. de Satigny, Genève / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Girardin, Roger 8, Chemin de l'Echarpine CH-1214 Vernier / CH | [1995/11] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1995/34] |
Former [1995/11] | Hugelin, Christiane c/o CHARMILLES TECHNOLOGIES SA Case postale 373 CH-1217 Meyrin 1 / CH | Application number, filing date | 94114063.4 | 08.09.1994 | [1995/11] | Priority number, date | CH19930002715 | 10.09.1993 Original published format: CH 271593 | [1995/11] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0642868 | Date: | 15.03.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B23H11/00 | [1995/11] | CPC: |
B23Q1/01 (EP,US);
B23H1/00 (EP,KR,US);
B23H11/00 (EP,KR,US);
B23H7/26 (EP,US);
B23H7/30 (EP,US);
B23Q1/012 (EP,US);
B23Q1/03 (EP,US);
B23Q1/25 (EP,US);
B23Q1/48 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, PT [1995/11] | Title | German: | Funkenerosionsmaschine mit neuartigem Maschinengestell | [1995/11] | English: | Electroerosion machine with novel frame structure | [1995/11] | French: | Machine d'électroérosion avec un bâti de structure nouvelle | [1995/11] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 16.09.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/28] | 13.02.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1996/28] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB1289196 (AGEMASPARK HOLDINGS LTD.) [Y] 2 * page 1, line 45 - line 54; figure 1 * * figure . *; | [Y]GB2138596 (INOUE JAPAX RES) [Y] 5 * page 4, line 31 - line 68 * * abstract *; | [A]US5091861 (GELLER YAIR [IL], et al) [A] 5* abstract *; | [XY] - J.L.C.WIJERS, "Alternatief concept zinkvonkmachine", PT/ WERKTUIGBOUW, NL, (198902), vol. 44, no. 2, pages 32 - 36, XP000022714 [X] 1,3,4 * figures 1,5,9 * [Y] 2,5 |