EP0646680 - Jet regulator to be connected to sanitary fixtures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.12.1999 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DIETER WILDFANG GmbH Klosterrunsstrasse 11 D-79379 Müllheim / DE | [1995/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nehm, Holger Auf der Röte 37 D-79379 Müllheim / DE | 02 /
Grether, Hermann Weilermatt 4 D-79379 Müllheim / DE | [1995/14] | Representative(s) | Schmitt, Hans, et al Maucher, Börjes & Kollegen Dreikönigstrasse 13 79102 Freiburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/14] | Schmitt, Hans, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte, Dipl.-Ing. Hans Schmitt, Dipl.-Ing. Wolfgang Maucher, Dipl.-Ing. RA H. Börjes-Pestalozza, Dreikönigstrasse 13 D-79102 Freiburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 94114419.8 | 14.09.1994 | [1995/14] | Priority number, date | DE19930014990U | 02.10.1993 Original published format: DE 9314990 U | [1995/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0646680 | Date: | 05.04.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0646680 | Date: | 10.02.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | E03C1/084, B05B1/18 | [1995/14] | CPC: |
E03C1/084 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, IT, LI [1995/14] | Title | German: | Strahlregler zum Anschluss an Sanitärarmaturen | [1995/14] | English: | Jet regulator to be connected to sanitary fixtures | [1995/14] | French: | Régulateur de jet à raccorder à une installation sanitaire | [1995/14] | Examination procedure | 10.02.1995 | Examination requested [1995/15] | 01.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.11.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.11.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1146816 (AGHNIDES ELIE P) [A] 1-27 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2745651 (VENLO METAALFAB BV) [A] 1-8,13-20 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE3000799 (WILDFANG DIETER KG [DE]); | [AD]DE3404662 (GROHE KG HANS [DE]) [AD] 1-27 * the whole document * |