EP0645898 - System for contactless transmission of data or power [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.11.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/13] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Feldtkeller, Martin, Dipl.-Ing. Quagliostrasse 14 D-81543 München / DE | [1995/13] | Application number, filing date | 94114868.6 | 21.09.1994 | [1995/13] | Priority number, date | DE19930014433U | 23.09.1993 Original published format: DE 9314433 U | [1995/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0645898 | Date: | 29.03.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0645898 | Date: | 24.04.1996 | [1996/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H04B5/00, E05B49/00 | [1995/13] | CPC: |
H04B5/70 (EP);
H01F27/363 (EP,US);
B60R25/04 (EP);
G07C9/00309 (EP);
H01F38/14 (EP);
G07C2009/00777 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/13] | Title | German: | System zur kontaktlosen Daten- bzw. Energieübertragung | [1995/13] | English: | System for contactless transmission of data or power | [1995/13] | French: | Système de transmission sans contact de données respectivement d'énergie | [1995/13] | Examination procedure | 20.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/33] | 10.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1996 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0073903 (CONTRAVES AG [CH]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 31 - page 3, line 18 ** page 5, line 26 - line 31 *; | [A]DE4036575 (BAUER KABA AG [CH]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 47 - line 24 * * column 3, line 59 - line 64 * |