EP0645430 - Thermoplastic resin composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.05.2000 [2000/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dai-Ichi Kogyo Seiyaku Co., Ltd. 55 Nishishichijo Higashikubo-cho Shimogyo-ku Kyoto / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/13] | For all designated states DAI-ICHI KOGYO SEIYAKU CO., LTD. 55 Nishishichijo Higashikubo-cho Shimogyo-ku Kyoto / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sumi, Hideyuki 7-12, Yamasaka 3-chome Higashisumiyoshi-ku, Osaka / JP | 02 /
Nakayama, Yutaka Kamigamohazama-cho 21 Kita-ku, Kyoto / JP | 03 /
Hotta, Hiroshi 12-120, Oharano-Nishisakaidani-cho 4-chome Nishikyo-ku, Kyoto / JP | [1995/13] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/13] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94115022.9 | 23.09.1994 | [1995/13] | Priority number, date | JP19930261482 | 24.09.1993 Original published format: JP 26148293 | JP19930261483 | 24.09.1993 Original published format: JP 26148393 | JP19930293941 | 29.10.1993 Original published format: JP 29394193 | JP19930346138 | 21.12.1993 Original published format: JP 34613893 | [1995/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0645430 | Date: | 29.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0645430 | Date: | 11.09.1996 | [1996/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0645430 | Date: | 26.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C08L33/06, C08L25/02, C08L23/02 | [1995/48] | CPC: |
C08L23/02 (EP);
C08L25/04 (EP);
C08L33/12 (EP);
C08L23/08 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L23/02, C08L2666/04 (EP);
C08L25/04, C08L2666/04 (EP);
C08L33/12, C08L2666/04 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1995/13] | C08L33/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1995/13] | Title | German: | Thermoplastische Kunstharzzusammensetzung | [1995/13] | English: | Thermoplastic resin composition | [1995/13] | French: | Composition résineux thermoplastique | [1995/13] | Examination procedure | 25.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/17] | 15.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.05.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.11.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH04198307 ; | [PA]JPH05295229 ; | [A]JPS62280248 ; | [PAPX]JPH05295244 ; | [A]JPH03177464 ; | [PX]JPH05295229 ; | [X]JPH0428733 ; | [A]EP0276111 (SUMITOMO CHEM. CO.) [A] 6,7,10 * claims 1,9,10 * | [XA] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 92, no. 35, Database accession no. 92-289040, XP002003755 & JPH04198307 A 19920717 (DAIICHI) [X] 10 * abstract * [A] 1-3 | [PA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 018, no. 097, & JP05295229 A 00000000 (DAI ICHI) [PA] 1-3 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 91, no. 11, Database accession no. 88-017954, XP002003756 & JPS62280248 A 19871205 (KOKOKU CHEM IND) [A] 1-3 * abstract * | [PAX] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 93, no. 49, Database accession no. 93-392870, XP002003757 & JPH05295244 A 19931109 (DAIICHI KOGYO SEIYAKU CO LTD) [PA] 1,10 * abstract * [PX] 10 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 91, no. 37, Database accession no. 91-270326, XP002003758 & JPH03177464 A 19910801 (TOKYO THREE BOND KK) [A] 1,10 * abstract * | [PX] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 93, no. 49, Database accession no. 93-392857, XP002003759 & JPH05295229 A 19931109 (DAIICHI KOGYO SEIYAKU CO LTD) [PX] 4,5,10 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 92, no. 11, Database accession no. 92-085301, XP002003760 & JPH0428733 A 19920131 (KURARAY KK) [X] 6,7,10 * abstract * |