EP0646943 - Color cathode-ray tube [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.1998 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.11.1998 [1998/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/48] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210 / JP | ||
Former [1995/14] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shoda, Akira, Intellectual Property Division K.K. Toshiba, 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105 / JP | 02 /
Suzuki, Yoshio, Intellectual Property Division K.K. Toshiba, 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105 / JP | 03 /
Yokoyama, Shoichi, Intellectual Property Division K.K. Toshiba, 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105 / JP | 04 /
Takahashi, Osamu, Intellectual Property Division K.K. Toshiba, 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105 / JP | [1995/27] |
Former [1995/14] | 01 /
Shoda, Akira Intell.Pty.Div., K.K. Toshiba, 1-1, Shibaura 1-cho Minato-ku, Tokyo 105 / JP | ||
02 /
Suzuki, Yoshio Intell.Pty.Div., K.K. Toshiba, 1-1, Shibaura 1-cho Minato-ku, Tokyo 105 / JP | |||
03 /
Yokoyama, Shoichi Intell.Pty.Div., K.K. Toshiba, 1-1, Shibaura 1-cho Minato-ku, Tokyo 105 / JP | |||
04 /
Takahashi, Osamu Intell.Pty.Div., K.K. Toshiba, 1-1, Shibaura 1-cho Minato-ku, Tokyo 105 / JP | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/14] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94115209.2 | 27.09.1994 | [1995/14] | Priority number, date | JP19930243475 | 30.09.1993 Original published format: JP 24347593 | [1995/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0646943 | Date: | 05.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0646943 | Date: | 29.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0646943 | Date: | 26.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H01J29/07 | [1995/14] | CPC: |
H01J29/07 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/14] | Title | German: | Farbkathodenstrahlröhre | [1995/14] | English: | Color cathode-ray tube | [1995/14] | French: | Tube à rayons cathodiques couleurs | [1995/14] | Examination procedure | 24.10.1994 | Examination requested [1995/14] | 05.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3944867 (KAPLAN SAM H) [A] 1,5 * figures 1,2,4,6 * * column 3, line 5 - line 12 *; | [A]US4122368 (MASTERTON WALTER DAVID) [A] 1,5 * figures 4,6 ** column 2, line 26 - line 37 *; | [A]GB2000367 (RCA CORP) [A] 1,5 * figures 2,6-10 * * page 1, line 49 - line 54 * * page 2, line 34 - line 77 *; | [A]GB2260856 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1,5 * figure 2 * * page 3, paragraph 3 * |