EP0648594 - Device for moulding articles of composite material and process using such a device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.1999 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MONTELL ITALIA S.p.A. Via Pergolesi 25 20124 Milano / IT | [1997/16] |
Former [1997/10] | For all designated states MONTELL ITALIA S.p.A. Via Rosellini 19 20124 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1995/16] | For all designated states CENTRO SVILUPPO SETTORI IMPIEGO S.r.l. 31, Foro Buonaparte I-20121 Milan / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Addeo, Antonio Via Cerruti 8 I-28100 Novara / IT | 02 /
Biscotti, Aurelio Via Risorgimento 99 I-20020 Cantalupo di Cerro Maggiore / IT | 03 /
Bonari, Roberto Via V. Veneto 12 I-20023 Cerro Maggiore / IT | [1995/16] | Representative(s) | Zanoli, Enrico, et al Basell Poliolefine Italia S.p.A. Intellectual Property P.le G. Donegani, 12 44100 Ferrara / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1995/16] | Zanoli, Enrico, et al Spherilene S.p.A. Via Taramelli 26/28 I-20124 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 94115339.7 | 29.09.1994 | [1995/16] | Priority number, date | IT1993MI02198 | 15.10.1993 Original published format: IT MI932198 | [1995/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0648594 | Date: | 19.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0648594 | Date: | 25.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0648594 | Date: | 04.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B29C70/48, B29C33/00 | [1995/16] | CPC: |
B29C67/246 (EP,US);
B29C45/14 (KR);
B29C33/0038 (EP,US);
B29C33/0061 (EP,US);
B29C70/548 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1998/25] |
Former [1995/16] | BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Formen von Gegenständen aus Verbundmaterialien | [1995/16] | English: | Device for moulding articles of composite material and process using such a device | [1995/16] | French: | Appareil et procédé pour le moulage d'objets en matériaux composites | [1995/16] | Examination procedure | 04.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/23] | 22.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.05.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 04.11.1998 | ES | 04.11.1998 | FR | 04.11.1998 | IT | 04.11.1998 | SE | 04.11.1998 | [2008/05] |
Former [2006/14] | BE | 04.11.1998 | |
ES | 04.11.1998 | ||
FR | 04.11.1998 | ||
SE | 04.11.1998 | ||
Former [2002/26] | BE | 04.11.1998 | |
ES | 04.11.1998 | ||
SE | 04.11.1998 | ||
FR | 02.04.1999 | ||
Former [2002/23] | BE | 04.11.1998 | |
SE | 04.11.1998 | ||
FR | 02.04.1999 | ||
Former [2000/22] | BE | 04.11.1998 | |
FR | 02.04.1999 | ||
Former [1999/32] | BE | 04.11.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1629650 (SEMPERIT OESTERREICHISCHE AMER) [A] 1 * page 5, paragraph 3; figure 1 *; | [A]DE2543877 (HENNECKE GMBH MASCHF) [A] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]CA1153343 (STINSON GLASER LIMITED) [A] 1,3,4 * figures 3,4; claims 1,2,4,11 *; | [A]EP0204577 (OLIN CORP [US]) [A] 1,4 * figure 2; claim 21 *; | [A]GB2198386 (HARPER ALAN) [A] 1,4 * page 6, paragraph 3; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0320302 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 2 * column 3, line 34 - line 42; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0517416 (BRITISH AEROSPACE [GB]) [A] 2* page 4, line 44 - line 47; figure 3 *; | [DA]EP0529651 (SVILUPPO SETTORI IMPIEGO SRL [IT]) [DA] 1,4 * example 1; claims 1,4 *; | [PA]DE4302661 (FELKEL ACHIM [DE]) [PA] 1,3,4 * the whole document * |