EP0657639 - Low creep flange and engine cover assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.06.1998 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2009 | Change - representative | published on 06.01.2010 [2010/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Freudenberg-NOK General Partnership 47690 East Anchor Court Plymouth, MI 48170 / US | [1995/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kiczek, Casimir Robert 16035 Homestead Circle Northville, MI 48167 / US | [1995/24] | Representative(s) | Wehnert, Werner, et al Patentanwälte Hauck, Graalfs, Wehnert, Döring, Siemons, Schildberg Schwanthalerstrasse 106 80339 München / DE | [2010/01] |
Former [1995/24] | Wehnert, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Mozartstrasse 23 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94115439.5 | 30.09.1994 | [1995/24] | Priority number, date | US19930151831 | 15.11.1993 Original published format: US 151831 | [1995/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0657639 | Date: | 14.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0657639 | Date: | 13.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F02F7/00 | [1995/24] | CPC: |
F02F7/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [1995/24] | Title | German: | Wenig kriechende Flansch und Zusammenbau eines Brennkraftmaschinesdeckels | [1995/24] | English: | Low creep flange and engine cover assembly | [1995/24] | French: | Bride à haute résistance au fluage et couvercle pour moteur à combustion interne | [1995/24] | Examination procedure | 07.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/01] | 30.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/30] | 19.02.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1997 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0070500 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1-4,6,17,18,20 * page 4, line 13 - page 12, line 12 * * figure - *; | [A]US4394853 (LOPEZ-CREVILLEN JOSE M, et al) [A] 1,8,10,11 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]FR2150939 (SULZER AG) [A] 1,12 * figure 2; claim - *; | [A]US5058542 (GRAYSON JAMES M [US], et al) [A] 1,14 * figures 1,2; claim - *; | [A]FR1595019 (IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD); | [A]FR2443576 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]); | [A]US4821699 (MACKIN ALAN [US]) |