EP0648019 - CMOS circuit with high withstand-voltage [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2007 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.08.2007 [2007/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Micronas GmbH Hans-Bunte-Strasse 19 79108 Freiburg i. Br. / DE | [2006/37] |
Former [2000/27] | For all designated states Micronas GmbH Hans-Bunte-Strasse 19 79108 Freiburg / DE | ||
Former [1998/06] | For all designated states Micronas Intermetall GmbH Hans-Bunte-Strasse 19 79108 Freiburg / DE | ||
Former [1995/15] | For all designated states Deutsche ITT Industries GmbH Hans-Bunte-Strasse 19 D-79108 Freiburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Blossfeld, Lothar, Dipl.-Phys. Dorfstrasse 16 D-79874 Breitnau / DE | 02 /
Theus, Ulrich, Dr.-Ing. Schönbergstrasse 5b D-79194 Gundelfingen / DE | 03 /
Motz, Mario, Dipl.-Ing. Einsiedelnstrasse 6 D-79346 Endingen / DE | [2006/36] |
Former [1995/15] | 01 /
Blossfeld, Lothar, Dipl.-Phys. Dorfstrasse 16 D-79874 Breitnau / DE | ||
02 /
Theus, Ulrich, Dr.-Ing. Schönbergstrasse 5b D-79194 Gundelfingen / DE | |||
03 /
Motz, Mario, Dipl.-Ing. Einsiedelnstrase 6 D-79346 Endingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 94115531.9 | 01.10.1994 | [1995/15] | Priority number, date | DE19934334513 | 09.10.1993 Original published format: DE 4334513 | [1995/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0648019 | Date: | 12.04.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0648019 | Date: | 26.02.1997 | [1997/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0648019 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/10, H03K17/0814, H03K19/003, H03K19/0185, H01L27/092 | [1997/07] | CPC: |
H03K17/102 (EP,US);
H01L27/08 (KR);
H01L27/0266 (EP,US);
H01L27/092 (EP,US);
H03K17/08142 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/15] | H03K17/10, H03K17/0814 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1995/15] | Title | German: | CMOS-Schaltung mit erhöhter Spannungsfestigkeit | [1995/15] | English: | CMOS circuit with high withstand-voltage | [1995/15] | French: | Circuit CMOS à tenue en tension élevée | [1995/15] | Examination procedure | 26.08.1997 | Examination requested [1997/43] | 17.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5243236 (MCDANIEL BART R [US]) [X] 1-4,7 * figures 4-8 * * column 3, line 13 - column 6, line 3 *; | [X]US5179297 (HSUEH KELVIN K [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 11, line 52 - column 15, line 11 * * figures 3,6 *; | [A]EP0094143 (AMERICAN MICRO SYST [US]) [A] 1,2 * abstract *; | [A]EP0316033 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0190027 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1,2 * abstract * |