EP0647825 - Model gun with automatic bullet supplying mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.1998 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.03.1998 [1998/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WESTERN ARMS 2-16-16 Jingumae Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/15] | For all designated states WESTERN ARMS 2-16-16 Jingumae Shibuya-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kunimoto, Keiichi 2-16-16 Jingumae Shibuya-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1995/15] | Representative(s) | Schmidt-Evers, Jürgen, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/15] | Schmidt-Evers, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner, Sonnenstrasse 33 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94115869.3 | 07.10.1994 | [1995/15] | Priority number, date | JP19930252881 | 08.10.1993 Original published format: JP 25288193 | [1995/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0647825 | Date: | 12.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0647825 | Date: | 12.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F41B11/02, F41B11/32 | [1995/15] | CPC: |
F41B11/56 (EP,US);
F41B11/62 (KR);
F41B11/721 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1995/15] | Title | German: | Spielzeugwaffe mit automatischem Kugelzuführsystem | [1995/15] | English: | Model gun with automatic bullet supplying mechanism | [1995/15] | French: | Arme jouet avec un système d'alimentation automatique des projectiles | [1995/15] | Examination procedure | 07.10.1994 | Examination requested [1995/15] | 27.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH03236598 ; | [A]US2881752 (BLAHNIK CARL E) [A] 1 * column 3, line 4 - column 4, line 66; figures 2,4 *; | [A]US3547095 (VADAS JOHN F, et al); | [A]JPH01167596 (FUARUKON TOOI KK) [A] 1 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]US5160795 (MILLIMAN KEITH L [US]) [A] 4-6 * column 6, line 7 - column 6, line 16; figures 1,7 *; | [E]EP0625689 (WESTERN ARMS CORP [JP]) [E] 1-3,6 * abstract * | [A] - & PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN Vol.13 No.434 (M-875) 28 September 1989 * Abstract * [A] 1 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920120), vol. 16, no. 21, Database accession no. (M - 1201), & JP03236598 A 00000000 (J A C PLANNING K.K.) [A] * abstract * |