EP0648667 - Foldable frame for vehicles with two or more wheels [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 19.01.2000 [2000/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DI BLASI INDUSTRIALE S.r.l. Contrada Risicone I-95049 Vizzini (Catania) / IT | [1996/50] |
Former [1995/16] | For all designated states DI BLASI S.r.l. Contrada Risicone I-95049 Vizzini (Catania) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Di Blasi, Carmelo Via Vittorio Emanuele 32 I-96015 Francofonte (Siracusa) / IT | 02 /
Di Blasi, Carlo Maria Via Messina 6 I-96015 Francofonte (Siracusa) / IT | [1995/16] | Representative(s) | Gervasi, Gemma, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1995/16] | Gervasi, Gemma, Dr., et al NOTARBARTOLO & GERVASI Srl Viale Bianca Maria 33 I-20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 94115980.8 | 11.10.1994 | [1995/16] | Priority number, date | IT1993FI00204 | 14.10.1993 Original published format: IT FI930204 | [1995/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0648667 | Date: | 19.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0648667 | Date: | 21.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B62K15/00 | [1995/16] | CPC: |
B62K15/006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1995/16] | Title | German: | Zusammenklappbarer Rahmen für Zweirad- und Dreiradfahrzeug | [1995/16] | English: | Foldable frame for vehicles with two or more wheels | [1995/16] | French: | Cadre pliable pour véhicule à deux ou trois roues | [1995/16] | Examination procedure | 04.10.1995 | Examination requested [1995/50] | 21.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.07.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 11.10.1998 | [2000/03] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1571849 (TOMY KOGYO CO) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [Y]US4284288 (FULTON ROGER G) [Y] 1 * column W *; | [YA]EP0058522 (HON CORP [US]) [Y] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2; | [A]EP0263554 (GADDI BRUNO) [A] 1* claim 2 * |