EP0657675 - Clamp structure with sawtooth-like locking arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.04.2000 [2000/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hans Oetiker AG Maschinen- und Apparatefabrik Oberdorfstrasse 21 8812 Horgen / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1999/15] | For all designated states Hans Oetiker AG Maschinen- und Apparatefabrik Oberdorfstrasse 21 8812 Horgen / CH | ||
Former [1995/24] | For all designated states Hans Oetiker AG Maschinen- und Apparatefabrik Oberdorfstrasse 21 CH-8812 Horgen / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oetiker, Hans Oberdorfstrasse 21 CH-8812 Horgen / CH | [1995/24] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/24] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94116194.5 | 13.10.1994 | [1995/24] | Priority number, date | US19930163530 | 09.12.1993 Original published format: US 163530 | [1995/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0657675 | Date: | 14.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0657675 | Date: | 24.07.1996 | [1996/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0657675 | Date: | 14.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F16L33/02, B65D63/10, B65D63/02 | [1996/26] | CPC: |
F16L33/035 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T24/1457 (EP,US);
Y10T24/1482 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/24] | F16L33/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1995/24] | Title | German: | Klemmschelle mit sägzahnförmiger Verschlussanordnung | [1995/24] | English: | Clamp structure with sawtooth-like locking arrangement | [1995/24] | French: | Collier de serrage avec dispositif de verrouillage à encliquetage en dents de scie | [1995/24] | Examination procedure | 20.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/09] | 28.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 29.09.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 14.10.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1804725 (WALKER WARD C) [A] 1,10,11 * figures 3,4 *; | [A]GB1416877 (CARR FASTENER CO LTD) [A] 1,8-11,18 * figure 2 *; | [XA]US4688337 (DILLNER JAMES [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 4; figures 1,3,4 * [A] 5-7,10,15-17; | [XA]US4881760 (RUNKLES RICHARD R [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5 * figures 1,6-8 * [A] 2,6,7,10; | [DA]US5230126 (OETIKER HANS [CH]) [DA] 1,12-14* figures 1-3 * |