EP0650814 - Device for pretreated plastic fractions, specially scrap portions, in a separation and cleaning apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states R+T UMWELT GmbH Naunhofer Strasse 75 D-04299 Leipzig / DE | [1995/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wünsch, Edgar Bruno-Baum-Ring 47 D-14712 Rathenow / DE | 02 /
Haliczinovski, Rainer Kiliansberg 5 D-98553 Hinternah / DE | 03 /
Pickert, Bernd Am Heuberg 5 D-14715 Göttlin / DE | [1999/01] |
Former [1995/18] | 01 /
Wünsch, Edgar Bruno-Baum-Ring 47 D-14712 Rathenow / DE | ||
02 /
Haliczinovski, Rainer Kiliansberg 5 D-98553 Hinternah / DE | |||
03 /
Pickert, Bernd Am Heuberg 5 D-14715 Göttlind / DE | Representative(s) | Spalthoff, Adolf, et al Patentanwälte, Dipl.-Ing. A. Spalthoff, Dipl.-Ing. K. Lelgemann, Postfach 34 02 20 45074 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/18] | Spalthoff, Adolf, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte, Dipl.-Ing. A. Spalthoff, Dipl.-Ing. K. Lelgemann, Postfach 34 02 20 D-45074 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 94116208.3 | 14.10.1994 | [1995/18] | Priority number, date | DE19934337207 | 30.10.1993 Original published format: DE 4337207 | [1995/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0650814 | Date: | 03.05.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0650814 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B29B17/02, B03B9/06, B03B11/00, B03B5/34, B04C5/04 | [1995/18] | CPC: |
B04C5/00 (EP);
B03B11/00 (EP);
B03B5/28 (EP);
B04C3/00 (EP);
B29B17/02 (EP);
B29B2017/0244 (EP);
B29K2105/065 (EP);
B29K2711/12 (EP);
B29L2007/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1995/18] | Title | German: | Eintragvorrichtung für vorbehandelte Kunststofffraktionen, insbesondere Kunststoffschnitzel, in eine Trenn- und Wascheinrichtung | [1995/18] | English: | Device for pretreated plastic fractions, specially scrap portions, in a separation and cleaning apparatus | [1995/18] | French: | Dispositif pour fractions prétraitées en matière plastique, spécialement de déchets coupés installé en un appareil pour la séparation et le lavage des déchets | [1995/18] | Examination procedure | 10.10.1995 | Examination requested [1995/49] | 18.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.07.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 07.01.1999 | GB | 07.01.1999 | IT | 07.01.1999 | NL | 07.01.1999 | [2008/05] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 07.01.1999 | |
GB | 07.01.1999 | ||
NL | 07.01.1999 | ||
Former [2003/08] | GB | 07.01.1999 | |
NL | 07.01.1999 | ||
FR | 04.06.1999 | ||
Former [2000/22] | GB | 07.01.1999 | |
FR | 04.06.1999 | ||
Former [2000/03] | GB | 07.01.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS5624121 ; | [A]DE2539960 (DAICEL LTD) [A] 1,2,8 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2900666 (BAHR ALBERT) [A] 1,2,8 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0304667 (AKW APPARATE VERFAHREN [DE]) [A] 1-6,8-11 * column 5, line 25 - line 28 * * column 6, line 43 - line 46 * * figures 1,2; claims 1-10 *; | [PA]DE4233372 (BUZGA HEINRICH [DE]) [PA] 1,2,8* the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19810514), vol. 5, no. 72, Database accession no. (M - 68)<744>, & JP56024121 A 19810307 (HITACHI ZOSEN K.K.) [X] 1,2,7,8 * abstract * | [A] - DR.-ING. GUIDO ROPERTZ, "NASSMECHANISCHE AUFBEREITUNG VON KUNSTSTOFFABFÄLLEN", CHEMIE- ANLAGEN + VERFAHREN, LEINFELDEN-ECHTERDINGEN DE, (198408), no. 8, pages 17 - 22 [A] 1-6,8-11 * page 18; figure 4 * * page 21, column L, line 10 - column M, line 10 * |