EP0656394 - By air humidity self curable copolymers and mixtures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.07.1997 [1997/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/23] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Filges, Ulrich, Dr. Otto-Dill-Str. 15 D-67433 Neustadt / DE | 02 /
Aydin, Oral, Dr. Sophienstr. 14 D-68165 Mannheim / DE | 03 /
Auchter, Gerhard, Dr. Paray-Le-Monial-Str. 10 D-67098 Bad Dürkheim / DE | 04 /
Barwich, Jürgen, Dr. Triftbrunnenweg 27 D-67434 Neustadt / DE | 05 /
Anders, Hermann, Dr. Gartenstr. 35a D-67149 Meckenheim / DE | 06 /
Langer, Werner, Dr. Wittelsbachstr. 41 D-67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | 07 /
Vorspohl, Klaus, Dr. Bannwasserstr. 9 D-67069 Ludwighafen / DE | [1995/23] | Application number, filing date | 94116228.1 | 23.11.1991 | [1995/23] | Priority number, date | DE19904038939 | 06.12.1990 Original published format: DE 4038939 | [1995/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0656394 | Date: | 07.06.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0656394 | Date: | 10.07.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C08L33/06, C08L31/02, C09D133/06, C09D131/02, C09J133/06, C09J131/02 | [1995/23] | CPC: |
C08F2/38 (EP,US);
C08F8/00 (EP,US);
C08F218/04 (EP,US);
C08F220/12 (EP,US);
C08F220/1802 (EP,US);
C08F8/30 (EP,US);
C08F8/46 (EP,US);
C08G18/307 (EP,US);
C08G18/3256 (EP,US);
C08G18/6229 (EP,US);
C08G18/6245 (EP,US);
C08G18/728 (EP,US);
C08K5/5406 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F8/00, C08F218/04 (US,EP);
C08F8/00, C08F218/08 (EP);
C08F8/00, C08F220/00 (EP,US);
C08F8/00, C08F220/12 (US,EP);
C08F8/30, C08F218/08 (EP);
C08F8/30, C08F220/00 (EP,US);
C08F8/46, C08F218/08 (EP);
C08F8/46, C08F220/00 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1995/23] | Title | German: | Mit Luftfeuchtigkeit selbsthärtbare Copolymerisate und Mischungen | [1995/23] | English: | By air humidity self curable copolymers and mixtures | [1995/23] | French: | Copolymères autoréticulables par l'humidité de l'air et mélanges | [1995/23] | Examination procedure | 01.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/23] | 06.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.01.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP91119998.2 / EP0493673 | Opposition(s) | 11.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2643642 (KOYO SANGYO K K) [A] 1-9 * claim - *; | JPS5434397 [ ] (OTA TOSHUKI); | [A]US4376187 (THEODORE ARES N, et al) [A] 1-9 * example 1; claim - *; | [A]EP0075206 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-9 * claim - *; | [A]EP0337976 (MONSANTO CO [US]) [A] 1-9 * claim - *; | [A]WO9000570 (BASF LACKE & FARBEN [DE]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | [A] - OTA, TOSHIYUKI, "Manufacture of polyurethanes", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19790820), vol. 91, no. 8, Database accession no. 58862, page 101 [A] 1-9 * abstract * |