EP0651218 - Device for continuous filtering and drying a suspension of solids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.05.1998 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.07.1998 [1998/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/18] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gehrmann, Dietrich, Dr. Wilhelm-Hastrich-Strasse 12 D-51381 Leverkusen / DE | 02 /
Schweigler, Norbert, Dr. Walter-Flex-Strasse 18 D-51373 Leverkusen / DE | [1995/18] | Application number, filing date | 94116326.3 | 17.10.1994 | [1995/18] | Priority number, date | DE19934336736 | 28.10.1993 Original published format: DE 4336736 | [1995/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0651218 | Date: | 03.05.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0651218 | Date: | 16.07.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F26B17/04, B01D33/66 | [1995/18] | CPC: |
F26B17/045 (EP,KR,US);
B01D33/04 (EP,KR,US);
B01D33/58 (EP,US);
B01D33/642 (EP,KR,US);
B01D33/644 (EP,US);
B01D33/66 (EP,US);
B01D33/663 (EP,KR,US);
B01D33/666 (EP,KR,US);
B01D35/31 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1995/18] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum kontinuierlichen Filtrieren und Trocknen einer Feststoffsuspension | [1995/18] | English: | Device for continuous filtering and drying a suspension of solids | [1995/18] | French: | Dispositif pour la filtration et le séchage continu d'une suspension de solides | [1995/18] | Examination procedure | 24.10.1995 | Examination requested [1995/51] | 20.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1604922 (R.HILDEBRAND) [A] 1,2,8 * column 4, line 7 - line 22; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]DE3115868 (KAMMER GUENTHER) [A] 1,6,9* the whole document *; | [A]EP0465951 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0465950 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 * | [A] - CHEMIE INGENIEUR TECHNIK, WEINHEIM, DE, (1969), vol. 41, no. 11, page 783 [A] 1 * the whole document * |