EP0655592 - Apparatus for cooling of foodstuffs, especially in an aircraft [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.1999 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.06.1999 [1999/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler Aerospace Airbus Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/12] | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler Aerospace Airbus Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [1998/28] | For all designated states Daimler-Benz Aerospace Airbus Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [1995/52] | For all designated states Daimler-Benz Aerospace Airbus Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Kreetslag 10 D-21129 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [1995/22] | For all designated states Daimler Benz Aerospace Airbus GmbH Kreetslag 10 D-21129 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kull, Harald Taterweg 3 D-23628 Krummesse / DE | 02 /
Scherer, Thomas, Dr. Dockenhudener Strasse 4 D-22587 Hamburg / DE | 03 /
Seidler, Siegfried Pumpberg Nr. 13 D-27386 Westerwalsede / DE | [1995/22] | Representative(s) | Hansmann, Dierk, et al Patentanwälte Hansmann-Klickow-Hansmann Jessenstrasse 4 22767 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/22] | Hansmann, Dierk, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Hansmann-Klickow-Hansmann Jessenstrasse 4 D-22767 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 94116360.2 | 15.10.1994 | [1995/22] | Priority number, date | DE19934340316 | 26.11.1993 Original published format: DE 4340316 | [1995/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0655592 | Date: | 31.05.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0655592 | Date: | 08.07.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F25D17/02, F25D15/00, B64D11/04 | [1995/22] | CPC: |
B64D11/04 (EP,US);
B64D11/0007 (EP,US);
B64D13/00 (EP,US);
F25D15/00 (EP,US);
F25D17/02 (EP,US);
B64D2013/0629 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/22] | Title | German: | Anordnung zur Kühlung von Lebensmitteln, insbesondere in einem Flugzeug | [1995/22] | English: | Apparatus for cooling of foodstuffs, especially in an aircraft | [1995/22] | French: | Dispositif pour le refroidissement des produits alimentations, en particulier dans un avion | [1995/22] | Examination procedure | 23.06.1995 | Examination requested [1995/34] | 03.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2689222 (GRANDI RENE [IT]) [Y] 1-4,6,7; | [A]FR2652885 (GRANDI RENE) [A] 1-3,6,7 * page 4 - page 5; figures 1,4 * | [Y] - "Flugtechnik: Bordküchen für die Boeing 747", TECHNISCHE RUNDSCHAU, BERN CH, (19711203), vol. 63, no. 51, page 31 [Y] 1-4,6,7 |