EP0652201 - Process for the production of concentrated aqueous formaldehyde solutions by pervaporation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.08.1995 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.1995 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.10.1995 [1995/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/19] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dams, Albrecht, Dr. Bornweg 19 D-67157 Wachenheim / DE | 02 /
Fried, Andreas, Dr. Johannes-Brahms-Strasse 7 D-67240 Bobenheim-Roxheim / DE | 03 /
Hammann, Fredy Haardtstrasse 15 D-67256 Weisenheim / DE | [1995/19] | Application number, filing date | 94116513.6 | 20.10.1994 | [1995/19] | Priority number, date | DE19934337231 | 30.10.1993 Original published format: DE 4337231 | [1995/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0652201 | Date: | 10.05.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C07C45/79, C07C45/78, C07C47/04 | [1995/19] | CPC: |
B01D61/362 (EP,US);
C07C45/786 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C45/786, C07C47/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1995/19] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Gewinnung konzentrierter wässriger Formaldehydlösungen durch Pervaporation | [1995/19] | English: | Process for the production of concentrated aqueous formaldehyde solutions by pervaporation | [1995/19] | French: | Procédé d'obtention de solutions concentrées aqueuses de formaldéhyde par pervaporation | [1995/19] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 23.02.1995 | Examination requested [1995/19] | 30.05.1995 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1995/40] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3750735 (CHIANG R, et al); | [X]US3950247 (CHIANG ROBERT, et al); | [Y]EP0372683 (TEXACO DEVELOPMENT CORP [US]); | [Y]US4978430 (NAKAGAWA KANJI [JP], et al) |