EP0659585 - Printing blanket with non-uniform profile [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/32] | For all designated states Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | ||
Former [1995/26] | For all designated states Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 D-69115 Heidelberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vrotacoe, James B. 7 Lake View Court Rochester, NH 03867 / US | 02 /
Gagne, Daniel Paul 73 Hooper Sands Road South Berwick, ME 03908 / US | 03 /
Hammond, Charles Reif 51 Sandy Brook Drive Durham, NH 03824 / US | [1999/32] |
Former [1999/31] | 01 /
Vrotacoe, James B. 7 Lakeview Court Rochester, NH 03867 / US | ||
02 /
Gagne, Daniel Paul 73 Hooper Sands Road South Berwick, ME 03908 / US | |||
03 /
Hammond, Charles Reif 51 Sandy Brook Drive Durham, NH 03824 / US | |||
Former [1999/23] | 01 /
Vrotacoe, James B. 7 Lakeview Court Rochester, NH 03867 / US | ||
02 /
Gagne, Daniel Paul 73 Hooper Sands Road South Berwick, ME 03908 / US | |||
03 /
Hammond, Charles Reif 3 Hubbard Road Dover, NH 03820 / US | |||
Former [1995/26] | 01 /
Vrotacoe, James B. 7 Lakeview Rochester, NH 03867 / US | Representative(s) | Fey, Hans-Jürgen, et al Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Patentabteilung Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/32] | Fey, Hans-Jürgen, et al Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Patentabteilung Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | ||
Former [1995/26] | Stoltenberg, Baldo Heinz-Herbert, et al c/o Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 D-69115 Heidelberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 94116700.9 | 22.10.1994 | [1995/26] | Priority number, date | US19930170956 | 21.12.1993 Original published format: US 170956 | [1995/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0659585 | Date: | 28.06.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0659585 | Date: | 11.08.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B41N10/02, B41F13/193 | [1995/26] | CPC: |
B41F13/193 (EP);
B41F30/04 (EP);
B41N10/02 (EP);
B41N10/04 (EP);
B41N2210/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1995/26] | Title | German: | Gummituch mit variierendem Profil | [1995/26] | English: | Printing blanket with non-uniform profile | [1995/26] | French: | Blanchet d'impression à profil non-uniforme | [1995/26] | Examination procedure | 22.10.1994 | Examination requested [1995/26] | 10.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 22.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.01.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/30] | Request for further processing for: | 22.05.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 22.05.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.06.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 11.08.1999 | SE | 11.08.1999 | [2002/26] |
Former [2002/23] | SE | 11.08.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH0592541 ; | [X]CH355786 (WINKLER FALLERT & CO MASCHF [CH]) [X] 1-6,8-16,18,30,31 * page 1, line 53 - page 2, line 60; figures 5-8 *; | [X]FR2157464 (MASCHF AUGSBURG NUERNBERG AG) [X] 1,2,6-10,12,13,17,18 * page 3, line 20 - page 4, line 3; figures 1,2 *; | [XA]DE3114580 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [X] 1-9,12-18,30,31 * the whole document * [A] 28; | [A]US4378737 (KIRKPATRICK ALAN D) [A] 19,20,26 * column 1, line 8 - line 18; figures 1-11 * * column 3, line 15 - line 49 *; | [A]FR2550730 (WIFAG MASCHF [CH]) [A] 19 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0194616 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [A] * the whole document * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930810), vol. 17, no. 430, Database accession no. (M - 1460), & JP05092541 A 19930416 (S P KIZAI K.K.) [X] 1,2,9 * abstract * [A] 10-13,18-20,25 | Examination | - STIEBNER, E. D., Bruckmann's Handbuch der Drucktechnik, 3. Auflage, Seite 180, MüNCHEN, BRUCKMANN, 1981 |