EP0650102 - Submodular unit for use in a modular rotary developing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.03.2000 [2000/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/17] | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd 3-6, 1-chome Nakamagome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sugihara, Kazuyuki 535-12 Harajuku-cho, Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Kosuge, Katsuhiro 6-8-2-702 Tachibana Sumida-Ku, Tokyo / JP | [1995/17] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/17] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Stuntzstrasse 16 D-81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94116812.2 | 25.10.1994 | [1995/17] | Priority number, date | JP19930266660 | 25.10.1993 Original published format: JP 26666093 | JP19930296658 | 26.11.1993 Original published format: JP 29665893 | [1995/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0650102 | Date: | 26.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0650102 | Date: | 24.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0650102 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/08, G03G15/01 | [1995/17] | CPC: |
G03G15/0126 (EP,US);
G03G15/0868 (EP,US);
G03G15/0889 (EP,US);
G03G15/0896 (EP,US);
G03G2215/0685 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1995/17] | Title | German: | Unterbaugruppe zur Benutzung in einem modularen, drehbaren Entwicklungsgerät | [1995/17] | English: | Submodular unit for use in a modular rotary developing apparatus | [1995/17] | French: | Sous-assemblage pour utilisation dans un appareil de développement rotatif modulaire | [1995/17] | Examination procedure | 25.10.1994 | Examination requested [1995/17] | 19.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.10.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.12.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 30.12.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2597993 (RICOH KK [JP]) [A] 1,12-15 * figure - *; | [A]US5115259 (ITOH MASAHIRO [JP]) [A] 1,12-15 * figures 3,4,9,10; claims 6-8 *; | [A]JPS59223468 ; | [A]US3953121 (REICHART JR LOUIS W) [A] 1,12-15 * figure -; claim 1 *; | [A]JPS61259282 ; | [A]JPS61103175 ; | [DA]US4792825 (SAITO TAKESHI [JP], et al) [DA] 1,12-15 * figure 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850426), vol. 9, no. 97, Database accession no. (P - 352)<1820> , & JP59223468 A 19841215 (FUJI XEROX) [A] 1,12-15 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870409), vol. 11, no. 112, Database accession no. (P - 565)<2559> , & JP61259282 A 19861117 (CANON) [A] 1,12-15 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860926), vol. 10, no. 284, Database accession no. (P - 501)<2340> , & JP61103175 A 19860521 (CANON) [A] 1,12-15 * abstract * | Examination | US4782360 |