EP0651362 - Multichannel radio alarm system using frequency hopping [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.03.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.05.2000 [2000/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GRUNDIG Aktiengesellschaft Kurgartenstrasse 37 90762 Fürth / DE | [1997/20] |
Former [1997/06] | For all designated states Grundig E.M.V. Elektro-Mechanische Versuchsanstalt Max Grundig GmbH & Co. KG Kurgartenstrasse 37 90762 Fürth / DE | ||
Former [1995/18] | For all designated states GRUNDIG E.M.V. Elektro-Mechanische Versuchsanstalt Max Grundig GmbH & Co. KG Kurgartenstrasse 37 D-90762 Fürth / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Elsinger, Horst, GRUNDIG E.M.V. Max Grundig GmbH & Co. KG D-90748 Fürth / DE | [1995/18] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1995/36] |
Former [1995/18] | Eichstädt, Alfred, Dipl.-Ing. Grundig E.M.V., Lizenzen und Patente D-90748 Fürth / DE | Application number, filing date | 94116872.6 | 26.10.1994 | [1995/18] | Priority number, date | DE19934337212 | 30.10.1993 Original published format: DE 4337212 | [1995/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0651362 | Date: | 03.05.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0651362 | Date: | 19.05.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G08B25/10 | [1995/18] | CPC: |
G08B25/10 (EP);
G08B25/007 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1995/18] | Title | German: | Funkalarmanlage mit einer Vielzahl von nach dem Frequenz-Hopping-Verfahren gebildeten Nachrichtenkanälen | [1995/18] | English: | Multichannel radio alarm system using frequency hopping | [1995/18] | French: | Système radio d'alarme à plusieurs canaux à transmission à saut de fréquence | [1995/18] | Examination procedure | 02.11.1995 | Examination requested [1995/52] | 14.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.11.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4234874 (SAYA WAYNE P) [A] 1 * column 1, line 6 - line 43; figure 1 *; | [A]DE3537149 (INT STANDARD ELECTRIC CORP [US]) [A] 1,2 * abstract *; | [AD]DE3415032 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [AD] * abstract *; | [AP]EP0599192 (GRUNDIG EMV [DE]) [AP] * column 1, line 29 - line 49 *; | [D]DE4239702 (GRUNDIG EMV [DE]); | [AP]EP0602563 (GRUNDIG EMV [DE]) [AP] * abstract *; | [A]US4977577 (ARTHUR JAMES D [US], et al) [A] * abstract * |