EP0651239 - Magnetostrictive torque sensor, magnetostrictive torque measuring apparatus, and condition - monitoring apparatus for a cutting tool using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.07.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.09.1998 [1998/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OMRON CORPORATION 10, Tsuchido-cho, Hanazono, Ukyo-ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 616 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/18] | For all designated states OMRON CORPORATION 10, Tsuchido-cho, Hanazono, Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 616 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sasada, Ichiro, c/o Omron Corporation 10, Hanazono, Tsuchidou-cho, Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto / JP | 02 /
Morikawa, Akihiko, c/o Omron Corporation 10, Hanazono, Tsuchidou-cho, Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto / JP | [1995/18] | Representative(s) | Wilhelms Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/18] | WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94117109.2 | 28.10.1994 | [1995/18] | Priority number, date | JP19930292402 | 29.10.1993 Original published format: JP 29240293 | JP19940064634 | 07.03.1994 Original published format: JP 6463494 | [1995/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0651239 | Date: | 03.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0651239 | Date: | 12.06.1996 | [1996/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G01L3/10, B23Q17/09 | [1995/18] | CPC: |
B23Q17/09 (EP,US);
G01L3/102 (EP,US);
G01L3/105 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/18] | Title | German: | Magnetostriktiver Drehmomentsensor, magnetostriktive Drehmomentmessvorrichtung und Vorrichtung zur Überwachung des Zustandes eines Schneidwerkzeuges | [1995/18] | English: | Magnetostrictive torque sensor, magnetostrictive torque measuring apparatus, and condition - monitoring apparatus for a cutting tool using the same | [1995/18] | French: | Capteur magnétostrictif de couple, appareil de mesure magnétostrictif de couple et appareil de surveillance de l'état d'un outil de coupe utilisant ce capteur | [1995/18] | Examination procedure | 24.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/18] | 04.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.03.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/37] | 17.04.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]JPH06221940 ; | [PY]JPH06241934 ; | [XY]US3866462 (FRAUDIN CLAUDE J) [X] 1-4 * column W * [Y] 8-10; | [XY]EP0046517 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [X] 5,6 * column W * [Y] 7-10; | [Y]EP0352187 (SENSORTECH LP [US]) [Y] 7 * page 8, line 31 - line 46; figure 6A *; | [PX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941114), vol. 18, no. 596, Database accession no. (P - 1825), & JP06221940 A 19940812 (I. SASADA) [PX] 1 * abstract * | [PY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941128), vol. 18, no. 624, Database accession no. (P - 1833), & JP06241934 A 19940902 (KUBOTA CORP) [PY] 8,10 * abstract * | [Y] - H.K. TÖNSHOFF ET AL., "BERÜHRUNGSLOSE MESSUNG DES DYNAMISCHEN BEARBEITUNGSMOMENTS ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG SCHLANKER ROTIERENDER WERKZEUGE", ELEKTROTECHNIK UND INFORMATIONSTECHNIK, WIEN AT, (1991), vol. 108, no. 6, pages 252 - 257, XP000235741 [Y] 9,10 * the whole document * |