EP0651250 - Data managing method in portable blood sugar value-measuring and portable blood sugar value-measuring apparatus using same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.01.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KYOTO DAIICHI KAGAKU CO., LTD. 57, Nishiaketa-cho Higashikujo Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto-fu / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/18] | For all designated states KYOTO DAIICHI KAGAKU CO., LTD. 57 Nishiaketa-cho Higashikujo Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hyodo, Hiroshi, c/o KYOTO DAIICHI KAGAKU CO., LTD. 57, Nishiaketa-cho, Higashikujo, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto-fu / JP | [1995/18] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2009/47] | Dallmeyer, Georg, et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1995/18] | Dallmeyer, Georg, et al Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus) D-50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 94117146.4 | 29.10.1994 | [1995/18] | Priority number, date | JP19930274228 | 02.11.1993 Original published format: JP 27422893 | [1995/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0651250 | Date: | 03.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0651250 | Date: | 26.03.1997 | [1997/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/49, A61B5/00, G01N33/487 | [1997/13] | CPC: |
G01N33/48792 (EP,US);
Y10S435/817 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/18] | G01N33/49, A61B5/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1995/18] | Title | German: | Datenverwaltungsverfahren für Messungen des Blutzuckergehaltes durch tragbare Messgeräte und tragbare Blutzuckergehaltmessvorrichtung, die das Verfahren benutzt | [1995/18] | English: | Data managing method in portable blood sugar value-measuring and portable blood sugar value-measuring apparatus using same | [1995/18] | French: | Méthode de gestion de données pour des mesures du taux de sucre sanguin par des appareils portables, et appareil de mesure du taux de sucre sanguin portable utilisant cette méthode | [1995/18] | Examination procedure | 24.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/30] | 19.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 14.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/08] | 11.09.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2002/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2001 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]WO9429705 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM CORP [US]) [AP] 1,9 * page 7, line 26 - page 10, line 28 *; | [AP]EP0645626 (ASULAB SA [CH]) [AP] 1,9 * column 5, line 25 - line 40 *; | [A]EP0245073 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [A] 1,9 * the whole document * |