EP0651405 - Cooled secondary of electric automobile charging transformer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 02.02.2000 [2000/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hughes Aircraft Company 7200 Hughes Terrace P.O. Box 45066 Los Angeles, California 90045-0066 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/18] | For all designated states Hughes Aircraft Company 7200 Hughes Terrace P.O. Box 45066 Los Angeles, California 90045-0066 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanzer, Herbert J. 20894 Waveview Drive Topanga, CA 90290 / US | 02 /
Quon, William 1641 Edgewood Drive Alhambra, CA 91803 / US | 03 /
Ramos, Sergio 1733 N. Broad Avenue Wilmington, CA 90744 / US | [1995/18] | Representative(s) | Otten, Hajo, et al Witte, Weller, Gahlert, Otten & Steil Patentanwälte Rotebühlstrasse 121 70178 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/18] | Otten, Hajo, Dr.-Ing., et al Witte, Weller, Gahlert & Otten Patentanwälte Rotebühlstrasse 121 D-70178 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 94117225.6 | 01.11.1994 | [1995/18] | Priority number, date | US19930146689 | 02.11.1993 Original published format: US 146689 | [1995/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0651405 | Date: | 03.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0651405 | Date: | 02.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H01F38/00, H01F38/14, H02J7/00 | [1995/18] | CPC: |
H02J7/0042 (EP,US);
H01F27/00 (KR);
B60L53/12 (EP,US);
B60L53/34 (EP,US);
F28D15/0233 (EP,US);
F28D15/0275 (EP,US);
H01F38/14 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US);
Y02T10/7072 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1995/18] | Title | German: | Gekühlte Sekundärwicklung eines zum Laden eines elektrischen Fahrzeug geeigneten Transformators | [1995/18] | English: | Cooled secondary of electric automobile charging transformer | [1995/18] | French: | Secondaire refroidi d'un transformateur chargeur de véhicule automobile électrique | [1995/18] | Examination procedure | 24.10.1995 | Examination requested [1995/51] | 02.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 02.04.1997 | GR | 02.04.1997 | [2000/05] |
Former [1998/10] | BE | 02.04.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1538044 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]DE4114576 (FIEDLER NORBERT [DE]); | [A]EP0552737 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]); | [A]EP0552738 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) | by applicant | FR1538044 | DE4114576 | EP0650240 |