EP0651475 - Optical demultiplexing module, optical multiplexing module and housings therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.01.1997 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.03.1997 [1997/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/18] | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Go, Hisao, c/o Yokohama Works of Sumitomo Electric Ind., Ltd, 1, Taya-cho, Sakae-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Kushida, Norimasa, c/o Yokohama Works of Sumitomo Electric Ind., Ltd, 1, Taya-cho, Sakae-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [1995/18] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/18] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94117290.0 | 02.11.1994 | [1995/18] | Priority number, date | JP19930274485 | 02.11.1993 Original published format: JP 27448593 | JP19940139984 | 22.06.1994 Original published format: JP 13998494 | [1995/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0651475 | Date: | 03.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0651475 | Date: | 29.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/06, H01S3/094 | [1995/18] | CPC: |
G02B6/2938 (EP,US);
H04B10/25 (KR);
G02B6/29361 (EP,US);
H01S3/06704 (EP,US);
H01S3/06754 (EP,US);
H04B10/291 (KR);
H01S3/0941 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1995/18] | Title | German: | Optischer Demultiplexier/Multiplexiermodul und ein Gehäuse dafür | [1995/18] | English: | Optical demultiplexing module, optical multiplexing module and housings therefor | [1995/18] | French: | Module de multiplexage/démultiplexage optique et boîtier correspondant | [1995/18] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 30.05.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/11] | 14.10.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1997/11] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 12.07.1996 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1996 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0444694 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,2,11,12 * column 6, line 20 - column 7, line 24 * * figure 3 *; | [Y]GB2245757 (KOKUSAI DENSHIN DENWA CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,2,11,12 * page 5, line 11 - line 18 * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0343489 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,3,7,11,15,17 * column 3, line 25 - line 38 * * figure 3 *; | [A]EP0325152 (ANT NACHRICHTENTECH [DE]) [A] 3,7,13,15,17 * column 3, line 13 - column 4, line 46 * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0238977 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 3,7,13,15,17 * column 3, line 37 - column 4, line 39 * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0409258 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP], et al) [A] 3,7,13,15,17 * column 5, line 42 - line 52 * * figure 3 *; | [A]FR2516254 (COMP GENERALE ELECTRICITE [FR]) [A] 1 * page 4, line 4 - page 5, line 7 * * figure 1 * |