EP0652283 - Cleaning of plastic [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.1997 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.03.1997 [1997/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/19] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rath, Heinz Jörg, Dr. Fuggerstrasse 40 D-63857 Waldaschaff / DE | 02 /
Stamprech, Peter, DI Kantstrasse 46 D-84508 Burgkirchen / DE | 03 /
Schuster, Michael, Prof. Dr. Bergmannstrasse 12 D-80339 München / DE | 04 /
Ringmann, Stefan, Dipl.-Chem. Eschenweg 4 D-85774 Unterföhring / DE | [1995/19] | Application number, filing date | 94117320.5 | 03.11.1994 | [1995/19] | Priority number, date | DE19934338021 | 08.11.1993 Original published format: DE 4338021 | [1995/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0652283 | Date: | 10.05.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0652283 | Date: | 20.03.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C11D7/18, C11D7/32, C11D3/39 | [1995/19] | CPC: |
C11D3/30 (EP);
C11D3/3947 (EP);
C11D7/3218 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1995/19] | Title | German: | Reinigung von Kunststoffen | [1995/19] | English: | Cleaning of plastic | [1995/19] | French: | Nettoyage de plastique | [1995/19] | Examination procedure | 14.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/22] | 14.03.1995 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 14.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.1995 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 01.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.09.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 02.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/11] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3022767 (UNILEVER NV) [X] 4-8; | [DA]US3908680 (KREZANOSKI JOSEPH Z) [DA] 1; | [A]DE4117972 (JOHN HILDEGARD [DE]) [A] 1,2,4,7,8 |