EP0653468 - Coating for clear-coat top layers and its use in processes for preparing multi-layer coatings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.02.1997 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.04.1997 [1997/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Herberts Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Christbusch 25 42285 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/20] | For all designated states Herberts Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Christbusch 25 D-42285 Wuppertal / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bederke, Klaus, Dr. Oststrasse 36 D-45549 Sprockhövel / DE | 02 /
Kerber, Herrmann Daniel-Schürmann-Weg 37 D-42369 Wuppertal / DE | 03 /
Dahm, Ralf Wemschebach 8 D-42929 Wermelskirchen / DE | 04 /
Reifferscheidt, Heinz Werner Immanuel-Kant-Strasse 39 D-44803 Bochum / DE | 05 /
Herrmann, Friedrich Friedrichsallee 27 D-42117 Wuppertal / DE | 06 /
Flosbach, Carmen, Dr. Düsseldorfer Strasse 55 D-42115 Wuppertal / DE | 07 /
Philipp, Dieter Hohenstein 140 D-42283 Wuppertal / DE | 08 /
Schubert, Walter, Dr. Unterdahl 22 D-42349 Wuppertal / DE | [1995/20] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/20] | Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Brucknerstrasse 20 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 94117557.2 | 08.11.1994 | [1995/20] | Priority number, date | DE19934338703 | 12.11.1993 Original published format: DE 4338703 | DE19944405042 | 17.02.1994 Original published format: DE 4405042 | [1995/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0653468 | Date: | 17.05.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0653468 | Date: | 13.12.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C09D133/04, C08G18/62, C08K5/16 | [1995/49] | CPC: |
C09D133/066 (EP,KR);
C09D175/00 (EP,KR);
C08G18/4063 (EP,KR);
C08G18/6254 (EP,KR);
C08G18/6258 (EP,KR);
C08L61/20 (EP,KR);
C08L75/00 (EP,KR)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C09D133/066, C08L2666/14, C08L2666/28 (EP);
C09D175/00, C08L2666/16 (EP) |
Former IPC [1995/20] | C09D133/04, C08K5/16, // (C09D133/04, 161:20) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, PT, SE [1995/20] | Title | German: | Überzugsmittel für transparente Decklackschichten und deren Verwendung bei Verfahren zur Herstellung von Mehrschichtüberzügen | [1995/20] | English: | Coating for clear-coat top layers and its use in processes for preparing multi-layer coatings | [1995/20] | French: | Revêtement pour les couches de couverture transparentes et utilisation dans des procédés de préparation des revêtements multicouches | [1995/20] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 14.06.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/16] | 12.11.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1997/16] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 31.07.1996 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1996 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE4223183 (HERBERTS GMBH) [Y] 1-11 * example -; claim - *; | [Y]DE2422043 (SHELL INT RESEARCH) [Y] 1-11 * example -; claim - *; | [DA]WO9315849 (BASF LACKE & FARBEN [DE]) [DA] 1 * claim - *; | [A]WO9015086 (BASF LACKE & FARBEN [DE]) [A] 1 * claim - * |