EP0658703 - Vibration damping device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.1998 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.04.1998 [1998/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 10-1, Kyobashi 1-Chome Chuo-Ku Tokyo 104-0031 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/25] | For all designated states BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION 10-1, Kyobashi 1-Chome Chuo-Ku Tokyo 104 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Watanabe, Isao 2741 Juno Road Akron, Ohio 44333 / US | 02 /
Weitzenhof, David A. 1590 Orchard Drive Akron, Ohio 44210 / US | 03 /
Rensel, John D. 624 East Avenue Tallmadge, Ohio 44278 / US | 04 /
Kawamata, Saturo 2-403-1 Kamikitadai Higashiyamato-shi Tokyo 207 / JP | [1995/25] | Representative(s) | von Raffay, Vincenz Patentanwälte Raffay & Fleck Geffckenstrasse 6 20249 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/25] | von Raffay, Vincenz, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Raffay, Fleck & Partner Postfach 32 32 17 D-20117 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 94117708.1 | 10.11.1994 | [1995/25] | Priority number, date | US19930159012 | 29.11.1993 Original published format: US 159012 | [1995/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0658703 | Date: | 21.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0658703 | Date: | 07.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F16F9/53, F16F9/10 | [1995/25] | CPC: |
B60G15/12 (EP,US);
F16F13/002 (EP,US);
F16F9/0472 (EP,US);
F16F9/103 (EP,US);
F16F9/532 (EP,US);
F16F2230/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1995/25] | Title | German: | Schwingungsdämpfende Vorrichtung | [1995/25] | English: | Vibration damping device | [1995/25] | French: | Dispositif d'amortissement de vibrations | [1995/25] | Examination procedure | 26.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/30] | 30.09.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US5180145 (WATANABE ISAO [JP], et al) [AD] 1 * column W *; | [A]EP0478273 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * column W *; | [AD]EP0414508 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [AD] 1 * column W *; | [AD]US4858733 (NOGUCHI TAKESHI [JP], et al) [AD] 1 * column A; figure - *; | [AD]US4854555 (OHKAWA FUJIO [JP], et al) [AD] 1 * column A; figure - *; | [AD]US4200270 (MERKLE JOSEF [DE]) [AD] 1 * column A; figure - *; | [AD]US3627297 (GAYDECKI JAN) [AD] 1 * column A; figure - *; | [AD]US4518154 (MERKLE JOSEF [DE]) [AD] 1 * column A; figure - *; | [A]US3046003 (SCHULTZ FORREST O E); | [A]DE3934821 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]); | [A]US4763883 (CRABTREE MICHAEL L [US]); | [A]GB830283 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER); | [A]US4504079 (STRONG JOHN R [US]) |