EP0653827 - An improved stator for two-phase electric machines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.12.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.01.1998 [1998/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BITRON S.p.A. Strada Del Portone 95 10095 Grugliasco (TO) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1996/17] | For all designated states BITRON S.p.A. Via Chiampo 35 I-10064 Pinerolo (Torino) / IT | ||
Former [1995/20] | For all designated states BITRON "A" S.p.A. Via Ligiard, 5 I-10060 Cantalupa (Torino) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
De Filippis, Pietro Via Ambrosini 1 I-20052 Monza, Milano / IT | 02 /
Avidano, Maurizio Via Vivaldi 2 I-10042 Nichelino, (Torino) / IT | [1995/20] | Representative(s) | Lotti, Giorgio, et al c/o Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 61 10128 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1995/20] | Lotti, Giorgio, et al c/o Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 61 I-10128 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 94117745.3 | 10.11.1994 | [1995/20] | Priority number, date | IT1993TO00856 | 12.11.1993 Original published format: IT TO930856 | [1995/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0653827 | Date: | 17.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0653827 | Date: | 29.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H02K1/16, H02K3/12, H02K21/22 | [1995/20] | CPC: |
H02K1/16 (EP);
H02K21/22 (EP);
H02K3/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1995/20] | Title | German: | Verbesserten Ständer für eine zweiphasige elektrische Maschine | [1995/20] | English: | An improved stator for two-phase electric machines | [1995/20] | French: | Stator amélioré pour machine électrique biphasée | [1995/20] | Examination procedure | 04.10.1995 | Examination requested [1995/48] | 15.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS57186936 ; | [A]JPS63110928 ; | [A]JPS59222051 ; | [A]GB1543150 (NEW FAN MFG LTD) [A] 1-5 * figure - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830209), vol. 007, no. 033, Database accession no. (E - 157), & JP57186936 A 19821117 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO KK) [A] 1-5 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880922), vol. 012, no. 355, Database accession no. (E - 661), & JP63110928 A 19880516 (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD) [A] 1-5 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850424), vol. 009, no. 095, Database accession no. (E - 310), & JP59222051 A 19841213 (KOKUSAN DENKI KK) [A] 1-5 * abstract * |