EP0658561 - Oligomeric phosphoric acid esters bearing hydroxyalkoxygroups, their preparation and use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.06.2000 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clariant GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [1997/51] |
Former [1995/25] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sicken, Martin, Dr. Mainstrasse 40 a D-51149 Köln / DE | [1995/25] | Application number, filing date | 94117991.3 | 15.11.1994 | [1995/25] | Priority number, date | DE19934342972 | 16.12.1993 Original published format: DE 4342972 | [1995/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0658561 | Date: | 21.06.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0658561 | Date: | 04.08.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/09, C08K5/521, C08L75/04 | [1995/25] | CPC: |
C07F9/091 (EP);
C07F9/093 (EP);
C08G18/3878 (EP);
C08G18/6461 (EP);
C08K5/521 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/521, C08L75/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1995/25] | Title | German: | Hydroxyalkoxygruppen tragende oligomere Phosphorsäureester, ihre Herstellung und Verwendung | [1995/25] | English: | Oligomeric phosphoric acid esters bearing hydroxyalkoxygroups, their preparation and use | [1995/25] | French: | Ester d'acides phosphoriques oligomères portant des groupes hydroxy alcoxy, leur préparation et leur utilisation | [1995/25] | Examination procedure | 21.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/08] | 04.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.01.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 04.08.1999 | IE | 04.08.1999 | DK | 04.11.1999 | CH | 30.11.1999 | LI | 30.11.1999 | [2003/45] |
Former [2001/23] | GR | 04.08.1999 | |
IE | 04.08.1999 | ||
CH | 30.11.1999 | ||
LI | 30.11.1999 | ||
Former [2001/12] | IE | 04.08.1999 | |
CH | 30.11.1999 | ||
LI | 30.11.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | CH | 30.11.1999 | |
LI | 30.11.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | JPH07613892 [ ] (TOYODA AUTOMOBILE INDUSTRY CO., LTD.;JAPAN); | [DY]DE2036595 (KNAPSACK AG) [DY] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [DY]DE2036587 (KNAPSACK AG) [DY] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE1518747 (KUHLMANN ETS) [Y] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [DY]EP0004747 (STAUFFER CHEMICAL CO [US]) [DY] 1-3* the whole document *; | [Y]US4697030 (HARDY THOMAS A [US], et al) [Y] 1-3 * column W * | [Y] - Nomura T et al, "Humidity- and fire-resistant polyurethane foams", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19760920), vol. 085, no. 12, Database accession no. 079067 [Y] 1-3 * abstract * |