EP0658669 - Transmission for converting a rotary movement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.1998 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.09.1998 [1998/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Deutschland GmbH & Co. Sicherheitssysteme Waldstrasse 2 85253 Erdweg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/41] | For all designated states Valeo Deutschland GmbH & Co. Sicherheitssysteme Waldstrasse 2 85253 Erdweg / DE | ||
Former [1995/25] | For all designated states Valeo Deutschland GmbH & Co. Sicherheitssysteme Waldstrasse 2 D-85253 Erdweg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Trautmann, Patrick 7 rue de Noyer F-67204 Achenheim / FR | 02 /
Linder, Anton Friedenstrasse 8 D-82216 Maisach / DE | 03 /
Trischberger, Werner Münchner Strasse 51 D-86551 Aichach / DE | [1995/25] | Representative(s) | Cohausz Hannig Borkowski Wissgott Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Schumannstrasse 97-99 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/25] | COHAUSZ HASE DAWIDOWICZ & PARTNER Patentanwälte Schumannstrasse 97-99 D-40237 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 94118104.2 | 17.11.1994 | [1995/25] | Priority number, date | DE19934342695 | 15.12.1993 Original published format: DE 4342695 | [1995/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0658669 | Date: | 21.06.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0658669 | Date: | 08.10.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | E05B17/04 | [1995/25] | CPC: |
E05B17/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1995/25] | Title | German: | Getriebe zum umsetzen einer Drehbewegung | [1995/25] | English: | Transmission for converting a rotary movement | [1995/25] | French: | Transmission pour convertir un mouvement rotatif | [1995/25] | Examination procedure | 09.06.1995 | Examination requested [1995/32] | 14.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]FR2691496 (VALEO SECURITE HABITACLE [FR]) [DA] 1 * the whole document * |