EP0657145 - Dental implant wrench [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 20.08.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.1999 | Refusal of application | published on 06.10.1999 [1999/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENTSPLY INTERNATIONAL 570 West College Avenue York Pennsylvania 17405 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/24] | For all designated states DENTSPLY INTERNATIONAL 570 West College Avenue York Pennsylvania 17405 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Balfour, Alan R. 5452 Quailridge Drive Camarillo, CA 93012 / US | 02 /
Patrick, Daniel R. 538 Arena Street El Segundo, CA 90245 / US | [1995/24] | Representative(s) | Wächtershäuser, Günter Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/24] | Wächtershäuser, Günter, Prof. Dr. Patentanwalt, Tal 29 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94118302.2 | 21.11.1994 | [1995/24] | Priority number, date | US19930163615 | 08.12.1993 Original published format: US 163615 | [1995/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0657145 | Date: | 14.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61C8/00, B25B23/14, B25B23/142 | [1995/24] | CPC: |
B25B23/1415 (EP,US);
A61C8/0089 (EP,US);
A61C1/186 (EP,US);
A61C2201/002 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1995/24] | Title | German: | Knarre für zahnmedizinische Implantate | [1995/24] | English: | Dental implant wrench | [1995/24] | French: | Clé de serrage pour implants dentaires | [1995/24] | Examination procedure | 28.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/04] | 21.11.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.05.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.05.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1999/40] | 22.05.1999 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1999/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1998 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB599547 (WILLIAM MATHEWS SIESEL) [A] 1-3,14 * the whole document *; | [Y]US4572041 (RISSMANN HORST-GUENTER [DE]) [Y] 1-4,8-12,14-17 * the whole document *; | [A]US4687392 (BIDWELL ROBERT E [US]) [A] 1-4,14,15* the whole document *; | [Y]DE8910080U (ZL MICRODENT ATTACHMENT) [Y] 1-4,8-12,14-17 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0446191 (NOBELPHARMA AB [SE]) [X] 1,2 * claim 1 * |