EP0654512 - Printing ink composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 22.07.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUN CHEMICAL CORPORATION 35 Waterview Boulevard Parsippany, NJ 07054-1285 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/18] | For all designated states Sun Chemical Corporation 35 Waterview Boulevard Parsippany, NJ 07054-1285 / US | ||
Former [2001/13] | For all designated states SUN CHEMICAL CORPORATION 222 Bridge Plaza South Fort Lee, NJ 07024 / US | ||
Former [1995/21] | For all designated states SUN CHEMICAL CORPORATION 222 Bridge Plaza South Fort Lee, NJ 07024 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wasilewski, Olgierd 18 Sherwood Road Edison, New Jersey 08820 / US | 02 /
Durand, Richard R., Jr. 492 North Avenue Wood Ridge, New Jersey 07075 / US | 03 /
Krishnan, Ramasamy 121 Inwood Avenue Colonia, New Jersey 07067 / US | 04 /
Do, Thi N. 82 Lessing Road West Orange, New Jersey 07052 / US | [1995/21] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/21] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94118356.8 | 22.11.1994 | [1995/21] | Priority number, date | US19930156537 | 23.11.1993 Original published format: US 156537 | [1995/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0654512 | Date: | 24.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0654512 | Date: | 14.08.1996 | [1996/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0654512 | Date: | 28.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/06 | [1995/21] | CPC: |
C09D11/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1995/21] | Title | German: | Druckfarbenzusammensetzung | [2000/46] | English: | Printing ink composition | [1995/21] | French: | Composition d'encre d'imprimerie | [1995/21] |
Former [1995/21] | Drucktinte-Zusammensetzung | Examination procedure | 07.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/15] | 21.01.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 28.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 02.10.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.12.2001
ADMISSIBLE SICPA S.A. Av. de Florissant 41 1008 Prilly / CH Opponent's representative Welch, Andreas, et al, et al Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2002/09] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.12.2001
ADMISSIBLE SICPA S.A. Av. de Florissant 41 1008 Prilly / CH Opponent's representative Welch, Andreas, et al, et al Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | 05.03.2003 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.09.2003 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 17.03.2005 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2005/36] | 17.03.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.04.2005 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 08.04.2005 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 28.03.2001 | SE | 28.06.2001 | ES | 27.09.2001 | AT | 22.11.2001 | CH | 30.11.2001 | LI | 30.11.2001 | PT | 31.05.2002 | NL | 01.06.2002 | DK | 31.12.2002 | [2004/04] |
Former [2003/47] | BE | 28.03.2001 | |
SE | 28.06.2001 | ||
AT | 22.11.2001 | ||
CH | 30.11.2001 | ||
LI | 30.11.2001 | ||
PT | 31.05.2002 | ||
NL | 01.06.2002 | ||
DK | 31.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/31] | BE | 28.03.2001 | |
SE | 28.06.2001 | ||
AT | 22.11.2001 | ||
CH | 30.11.2001 | ||
LI | 30.11.2001 | ||
PT | 31.05.2002 | ||
NL | 01.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/06] | BE | 28.03.2001 | |
SE | 28.06.2001 | ||
CH | 30.11.2001 | ||
LI | 30.11.2001 | ||
PT | 31.05.2002 | ||
NL | 01.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | BE | 28.03.2001 | |
SE | 28.06.2001 | ||
CH | 30.11.2001 | ||
LI | 30.11.2001 | ||
Former [2002/05] | BE | 28.03.2001 | |
SE | 28.06.2001 | ||
Former [2002/03] | BE | 28.03.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]SU885079 ; | [A]JPH0391572 ; | [X]GB388072 (ICI LTD, et al) [X] 1,2,4 * claims 1-3 * * page 2, line 87 - line 123 *; | [X]GB445701 (AUGUST CHWALA) [X] 1,4 * claim . * * page 1, line 16 - line 20 *; | [A]DE767021 (GEHA WERKE GEBRUEDER HARTMANN) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]UST886005I (WOLINKSI L.E.) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US3819386 (HIGGINS W, et al) [A] 1 * claim 1 * * column 1, line 17 - line 21 * * column 2, line 4 - line 17 * * column 8, line 45 - line 51 *; | [X]EP0229377 (GAMBLIN RODGER L) [X] 1,4,5 * claims 1,2 * * page 5, column 8, line 14 - line 36 * * page 7, column 11, line 19 - line 27 *; | [A]US4773932 (GAMBLIN RODGER L [US]) [A] 1* claims 1,5 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 82-83217E[39], XP002006289 & SU885079 A 19811130 (PAPER CENT RES INST ET AL) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 91-158429[22], XP002006290 & JPH0391572 A 19910417 (DAINIPPON INK CHEM KK) [A] 1 * abstract * |