EP0654790 - Memory device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.2000 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.04.2000 [2000/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/16] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | ||
Former [1995/21] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Toda, Haruki 803, Heimat Yokohama, 72-1, Sanya, Minami-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1995/21] | Representative(s) | Lehn, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/21] | Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 D-81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94118498.8 | 24.11.1994 | [1995/21] | Priority number, date | JP19930293577 | 24.11.1993 Original published format: JP 29357793 | [1995/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0654790 | Date: | 24.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0654790 | Date: | 16.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0654790 | Date: | 21.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G11C11/409 | [1995/21] | CPC: |
G11C11/406 (EP,KR,US);
G11C11/4096 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/21] | Title | German: | Speicheranordnung | [1995/21] | English: | Memory device | [1995/21] | French: | Dispositif de mémoire | [1995/21] | Examination procedure | 24.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/21] | 26.06.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.10.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0271067 (TOSHIBA KK [JP], et al); | [A]EP0503504 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) |