EP0659990 - Method and device for controlling an internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.05.2000 [2000/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [1999/21] |
Former [1995/26] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Altmann, Uwe, Dipl.- Ing. Auenweg 8 D-71701 Schwieberdingen / DE | 02 /
Grieshaber, Hermann, Dipl.-Ing. Haldenstrasse 69 D-72631 Aichtal / DE | [1995/26] | Application number, filing date | 94118536.5 | 25.11.1994 | [1995/26] | Priority number, date | DE19934344138 | 23.12.1993 Original published format: DE 4344138 | [1995/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0659990 | Date: | 28.06.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0659990 | Date: | 26.05.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F02B29/04, F01P7/04 | [1995/26] | CPC: |
F01P7/04 (EP,US);
F02B29/0431 (EP,US);
F02B29/0493 (EP,US);
F01P2023/08 (EP,US);
F01P2025/08 (EP,US);
F01P2025/60 (EP,US);
F01P2025/62 (EP,US);
F01P2025/64 (EP,US);
F01P2060/02 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1995/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Steuerung einer Brennkraftmaschine | [1995/26] | English: | Method and device for controlling an internal combustion engine | [1995/26] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de contrôle d'un moteur à combustion interne | [1995/26] | Examination procedure | 28.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/09] | 03.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 12.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 24.11.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDA]DE3838404 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [XD] 1,2,6-8 * das ganze Dokument * [AD] 3; | [X]EP0496085 (MAN NUTZFAHRZEUGE AG [DE]) [X] 1,3-5,7 * column 2, line 32 - column 4, line 12; figure 1 * * Anspruch 4 *; | [X]US5201285 (MCTAGGART LESTER E [US]) [X] 1,2,7 * column 5, line 61 - column 6, line 24; figure 3 *; | [XA]DE2231254 (MUEHLBERG ERHARD PROF DR ING) [X] 1,7 * page 9, paragraph 2; figure 4 * [A] 2 |