EP0713917 - Process for hydrolysis of polyunsaturated fatty acid triglycerides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.06.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.1996 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.08.1996 [1996/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A. Case postale 353 1800 Vevey / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1996/22] | For all designated states SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A. Case postale 353 CH-1800 Vevey / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wille, Hans-Jürgen Ch. de la Colice 10 CH-1844 Villeneuve / CH | [1996/22] | Representative(s) | Archambault, Jean 55, avenue Nestlé 1800 Vevey / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1996/22] | Archambault, Jean 55, avenue Nestlé CH-1800 Vevey / CH | Application number, filing date | 94118663.7 | 28.11.1994 | [1996/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0713917 | Date: | 29.05.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C12P7/64 | [1996/22] | CPC: |
C12P7/6427 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1996/22] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Hydrolyse von polyungesättigten Fettsäuretriglyceriden | [1996/22] | English: | Process for hydrolysis of polyunsaturated fatty acid triglycerides | [1996/22] | French: | Procédé d'hydrolyse des triglycérides d'acides gras polyinsaturés | [1996/22] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 18.06.1996 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1996/32] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2603900 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]); | [A]US4865978 (SEROTA SAMUEL [US]) |