EP0656429 - Ferroelectric thin film and method of manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [1995/23] | For all designated states Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. 1-9-25, Kohamanishi, Suminoe-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 559 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tomozawa, Atsushi, Matsushita Elec. Ind. Co., Ltd. 1-9-25, Kohamanishi, Suminoe-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 559 / JP | 02 /
Fujii, Satoru, Matsushita Elec. Ind. Co., Ltd. 1-14-12, Tsukawaki Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569 / JP | 03 /
Fujii, Eiji, Matsushita Elec. Ind. Co., Ltd. A23-304, Otokoyama Kouro 1-banchi Yawata-shi, Kyoto 614 / JP | 04 /
Takayama, Ryoichi, Matsushita Elec. Ind. Co., Ltd. 8-33, Fujigaoka-cho Suita-shi, Osaka 564 / JP | 05 /
Kobune, Masafumi Himeji Institute of Technology, 10-20, Satsuki-cho Akou-shi, Hyogo 678-02 / JP | 06 /
Fujii, Satoshi, Himeji Institute of Technology 3-1-1, Kitashinzaike Himeji-shi, Hyogo 670 / JP | [1995/23] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/23] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94118853.4 | 30.11.1994 | [1995/23] | Priority number, date | JP19930301411 | 01.12.1993 Original published format: JP 30141193 | [1995/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0656429 | Date: | 07.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0656429 | Date: | 12.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/08, C30B23/02, C23C14/34, C04B35/472, H01L31/18 | [1995/23] | CPC: |
C04B35/472 (EP,US);
H01L21/31 (KR);
H10N30/076 (EP,US);
C23C14/08 (EP,US);
C23C14/34 (KR);
C23C14/3414 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/23] | Title | German: | Ferroelektrische Dünnschicht sowie Verfahren zur dessen Herstellung | [1995/23] | English: | Ferroelectric thin film and method of manufacturing the same | [1995/23] | French: | Couche mince ferroélectrique et méthode pour sa production | [1995/23] | Examination procedure | 12.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/28] | 13.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 27.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 02.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]JPH03245406 ; | [YD]JPS59141427 ; | [A]DE4121474 (UBE INDUSTRIES [JP]); | [A]EP0514150 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); |