EP0657177 - Device for testing and controlling of steam sterilizers working according to vacuum process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.2000 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SECUNDUS Medizinische Kontrollsysteme GmbH Pastor-Dehnert-Strasse 42 41516 Grevenbroich / DE | [1999/16] |
Former [1997/28] | For all designated states Fa. SECUNDUS Medizinische Kontrollsysteme GmbH Pastor-Dehnert-Strasse 42 41516 Grevenbroich / DE | ||
Former [1995/24] | For all designated states Fa. SECUNDUS Medizinische Kontrollsysteme GmbH Hülser Strasse 73 D-47918 Tönisvorst / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brink, Maria Hülser Strasse 73 D-47918 Tönisvorst / DE | 02 /
Schefter, Siegfried Pastor-Dehnert-Strasse 42 41516 Grevenbroich / DE | [1997/47] |
Former [1995/24] | 01 /
Brink, Maria Hülser Strasse 73 D-47918 Tönisvorst / DE | Representative(s) | von Creytz, Dietrich Tannenweg 25 41844 Wegberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/47] | von Creytz, Dietrich, Dipl.-Phys. Tannenweg 25 41844 Wegberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 94118915.1 | 01.12.1994 | [1995/24] | Priority number, date | DE19930018855U | 08.12.1993 Original published format: DE 9318855 U | DE19940015097U | 18.09.1994 Original published format: DE 9415097 U | [1995/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0657177 | Date: | 14.06.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0657177 | Date: | 02.11.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0657177 | Date: | 21.04.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61L2/26, C12Q1/22 | [1995/24] | CPC: |
A61L2/28 (EP);
A61L2/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1995/24] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Testen und Kontrollieren von nach dem Vakuumverfahren arbeitenden Dampfsterilisatoren | [1995/24] | English: | Device for testing and controlling of steam sterilizers working according to vacuum process | [1995/24] | French: | Dispositif pour tester et contrôler des sterilisateurs à vapeur fonctionnant selon le procédé sous vide | [1995/24] | Examination procedure | 16.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/02] | 09.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.10.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.02.1995 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   16.02.1995 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 21.04.1999 | FR | 21.04.1999 | GB | 21.04.1999 | GR | 21.04.1999 | IT | 21.04.1999 | NL | 21.04.1999 | SE | 21.04.1999 | DK | 21.07.1999 | PT | 23.07.1999 | LU | 01.12.1999 | BE | 31.12.1999 | [2008/05] |
Former [2007/29] | ES | 21.04.1999 | |
FR | 21.04.1999 | ||
GB | 21.04.1999 | ||
GR | 21.04.1999 | ||
NL | 21.04.1999 | ||
SE | 21.04.1999 | ||
DK | 21.07.1999 | ||
PT | 23.07.1999 | ||
LU | 01.12.1999 | ||
BE | 31.12.1999 | ||
Former [2006/14] | ES | 21.04.1999 | |
FR | 21.04.1999 | ||
GB | 21.04.1999 | ||
GR | 21.04.1999 | ||
NL | 21.04.1999 | ||
SE | 21.04.1999 | ||
DK | 21.07.1999 | ||
PT | 23.07.1999 | ||
BE | 31.12.1999 | ||
Former [2003/45] | ES | 21.04.1999 | |
GB | 21.04.1999 | ||
GR | 21.04.1999 | ||
NL | 21.04.1999 | ||
SE | 21.04.1999 | ||
DK | 21.07.1999 | ||
PT | 23.07.1999 | ||
FR | 17.09.1999 | ||
BE | 31.12.1999 | ||
Former [2003/08] | ES | 21.04.1999 | |
GB | 21.04.1999 | ||
GR | 21.04.1999 | ||
NL | 21.04.1999 | ||
SE | 21.04.1999 | ||
PT | 23.07.1999 | ||
FR | 17.09.1999 | ||
BE | 31.12.1999 | ||
Former [2002/26] | ES | 21.04.1999 | |
GB | 21.04.1999 | ||
GR | 21.04.1999 | ||
SE | 21.04.1999 | ||
PT | 23.07.1999 | ||
FR | 17.09.1999 | ||
BE | 31.12.1999 | ||
Former [2002/23] | GB | 21.04.1999 | |
GR | 21.04.1999 | ||
SE | 21.04.1999 | ||
PT | 23.07.1999 | ||
FR | 17.09.1999 | ||
BE | 31.12.1999 | ||
Former [2001/23] | GB | 21.04.1999 | |
GR | 21.04.1999 | ||
PT | 23.07.1999 | ||
FR | 17.09.1999 | ||
BE | 31.12.1999 | ||
Former [2001/08] | GB | 21.04.1999 | |
PT | 23.07.1999 | ||
FR | 17.09.1999 | ||
BE | 31.12.1999 | ||
Former [2001/05] | GB | 21.04.1999 | |
PT | 23.07.1999 | ||
FR | 17.09.1999 | ||
Former [2000/25] | PT | 23.07.1999 | |
FR | 17.09.1999 | ||
Former [2000/24] | FR | 17.09.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0419282 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [DA] 1-4 * figures 1-7 *; | [PX]DE9401058U (SCHEFTER SIEGFRIED [DE]) [PX] 1* figures 1,2 *; | [PX]DE9415097U (BRINK MARIA [DE]) [PX] 1-4 * figures 1-5 * |