EP0648849 - Copper refining furnace [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 28.05.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2004 | New entry: Fee for printing new specification paid | 28.05.2004 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 14.07.2004 [2004/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION 5-1, Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/50] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION 5-1, Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1995/16] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION 6-1, Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goto, Moto, c/o Mitsubishi Materials Corp. 6-1, Otemachi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kikumoto, Nobuo, c/o Mitsubishi Materials Corp. 4-1, Hamamatsu-cho 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Iida, Osamu, c/o Mitsubishi Materials Corp. 4-1, Hamamatsu-cho 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1995/16] | Representative(s) | Füchsle, Klaus, et al Hoffmann - Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/16] | Füchsle, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 D-81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94119082.9 | 19.11.1991 | [1995/16] | Priority number, date | JP19900314671 | 20.11.1990 Original published format: JP 31467190 | JP19900314675 | 20.11.1990 Original published format: JP 31467590 | JP19900314682 | 20.11.1990 Original published format: JP 31468290 | [1995/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0648849 | Date: | 19.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0648849 | Date: | 25.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/17] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0648849 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C22B15/00, C22B15/14 | [1995/16] | CPC: |
C22B15/0039 (EP,US);
C22B15/00 (KR);
C22B15/003 (EP,US);
C22B15/005 (EP,US);
C22B15/006 (EP,US);
Y02P10/25 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, SE [1995/16] | Title | German: | Raffinationsofen für Kupfer | [1995/16] | English: | Copper refining furnace | [1995/16] | French: | Four pour le raffinage du cuivre | [1995/16] | Examination procedure | 13.06.1995 | Examination requested [1995/32] | 08.01.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.10.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP91119729.1 / EP0487031 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
14.01.2002
05.02.2002
ADMISSIBLE OUTOKUMPU OYJ Riihitontuntie 7 FIN-02201 ESPOO / FI Opponent's representative Wahl, Hendrik Graf Glück Habersack Kritzenberger Wotanstrasse 64 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/11] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.01.2002
OUTOKUMPU OYJ Riihitontuntie 7 FIN-02201 ESPOO / FI Opponent's representative Wahl, Hendrik, Dr.-Ing. Zipse & Habersack, Wotanstrasse 64 80639 München / DE | 08.03.2002 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 09.09.2002 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 23.10.2003 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 23.10.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.11.2003 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 12.11.2003 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 05.03.2004 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 18.05.2004 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 19.11.2002 | [2004/22] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1198434 (GARRED ULYSSES A [US]) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US3901489 (SUZUKI TAKASHI, et al) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE2837160 (NORDDEUTSCHE AFFINERIE) [A] 1* figures 1,2 *; | [A]GB2141535 (INSPIRATION CONS COPPER) [A] 1 * figures 1-5 * | Opposition | US3650519 | US4238228 | US4245821 | US4396181 | - A.K. Biswas et al., Extractive Metallurgy of Copper, Perhamon Press, 1976, p. 242-245 |