EP0658045 - Timing of deflection waveform correction circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.12.2000 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.01.2001 [2001/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, INC. 10330 North Meridian St. Indianapolis, IN 46206 / US | [1995/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Truskalo, Walter 5220 Nob Lane Indianapolis, IN 46226 / US | [1995/24] | Representative(s) | Wördemann, Hermes Deutsche Thomson OHG European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/24] | Wördemann, Hermes, Dipl.-Ing. Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH, Patent Dept., Göttinger Chaussee 76 D-30453 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 94119085.2 | 03.12.1994 | [1995/24] | Priority number, date | US19930165202 | 13.12.1993 Original published format: US 165202 | [1995/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0658045 | Date: | 14.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0658045 | Date: | 29.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0658045 | Date: | 09.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H04N3/233 | [1995/24] | CPC: |
H04N3/233 (EP,US);
H04N3/223 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/24] | Title | German: | Synchronisierung einer Ablenkungswellenformkorrekturschaltung | [1995/24] | English: | Timing of deflection waveform correction circuit | [1995/24] | French: | Synchronisation d'un circuit de correction de forme d'onde de déflection | [1995/24] | Examination procedure | 17.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/37] | 23.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.08.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.11.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 10.07.1996 | M01   Fee paid on   17.07.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2387552 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1,13,18,23* page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 21 *; | [A]GB2150796 (RCA CORP) [A] 1,13,18,23 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 34; figure 1 *; | [A]US5043637 (GRIES ROBERT J [US], et al) [A] 1,13,18,23 * the whole document * |