EP0657456 - Process for preparing epibatidine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1998 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EGIS GYÓGYSZERGYÁR RT. Keresztúri út 30-38 1106 Budapest / HU | [N/P] |
Former [1995/24] | For all designated states EGIS GYOGYSZERGYAR RT. Kereszturi ut 30-38 H-1106 Budapest / HU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Csaba Szantay Dr., chemical engineer 8 Zsombolyai u. H-1113 Budapest / HU | 02 /
Zsuzsanna Balogh née Kardos, Dr., chemist 7/b Galgoczy köz H-1125 Budapest / HU | 03 /
Istvan Moldvai, Dr., chemistry teacher 107 Kossuth L.u. H-1212 Budapest / HU | 04 /
Eszter Temesvari née Major, Dr., chemical engineer 52 Ratz L.u. H-1116 Budapest / HU | 05 /
Csaba Szantay jr., Dr., chemical engineer 8 Zsombolyai u. H-1113 Budapest / HU | 06 /
Attila Mandi, Dr., chemical engineer 12 Riado u. H-1026 Budapest / HU | 07 /
Gabor Blasko, Dr., chemical engineer 12 Molnar E. u. H-1113 Budapest / HU | 08 /
Gyula Simig, Dr., chemical engineer 25 Hollosy S. u. H-1126 Budapest / HU | 09 /
* * * | 10 /
Sandor Drabant, Dr., physician 27 Körömvirag u. H-1171 Budapest / HU | 11 /
Tamas Szallasi, Dr., physician 44 Margit krt. H-1027 Budapest / HU | 12 /
Marton Fekete, Dr., physician 49 Fo u. H-1027 Budapest / HU | 13 /
Gabor Gigler, biologist 41 Terez krt. H-1067 Budapest / HU | [1995/24] | Representative(s) | Beszédes, Stephan G. Patentanwalt Münchener Strasse 80a 85221 Dachau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/24] | Beszédes, Stephan G., Dr. Patentanwalt, Münchener Strasse 80a D-85221 Dachau / DE | Application number, filing date | 94119544.8 | 09.12.1994 | [1995/24] | Priority number, date | HU19350000593 | 09.12.1993 Original published format: HU 3500593 | HU19350000593 | 06.10.1994 Original published format: HU 3500593 | [1995/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0657456 | Date: | 14.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0657456 | Date: | 04.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/08, A61K31/44 | [1995/24] | CPC: |
C07D487/08 (EP,KR,US);
A61P25/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, GB, LI, NL, SE [1995/24] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Epibatidin | [1995/24] | English: | Process for preparing epibatidine | [1995/24] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation d'épibatidine | [1995/24] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1996/33: Teilanmeldung 96107729.4 eingereicht am 15/05/96 | EPB 1996/33: Divisional application 96107729.4 filed on 15/05/96 | EPB 1996/33: Demande divisionnaire 96107729.4 déposée le 15/05/96 | Examination procedure | 23.08.1995 | Examination requested [1995/42] | 23.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.11.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP96107729.4 / EP0736534 | Opposition(s) | 05.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.06.1997 | CH | 04.06.1997 | DK | 04.06.1997 | LI | 04.06.1997 | NL | 04.06.1997 | DE | 29.07.1997 | SE | 04.09.1997 | [2003/08] |
Former [1998/15] | AT | 04.06.1997 | |
CH | 04.06.1997 | ||
DK | 04.06.1997 | ||
LI | 04.06.1997 | ||
DE | 29.07.1997 | ||
SE | 04.09.1997 | ||
Former [1998/12] | AT | 04.06.1997 | |
CH | 04.06.1997 | ||
LI | 04.06.1997 | ||
DE | 29.07.1997 | ||
SE | 04.09.1997 | ||
Former [1998/04] | AT | 04.06.1997 | |
CH | 04.06.1997 | ||
LI | 04.06.1997 | ||
DE | 29.07.1997 | ||
Former [1998/03] | AT | 04.06.1997 | |
DE | 29.07.1997 | ||
Former [1998/02] | AT | 04.06.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO9318037 (US HEALTH [US]) [AD] 1 *scheme 1*; | [XD] - S.R. FLETCHER ET AL., "The synthesis of (+)- and (-)-epibatidine", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS, LETCHWORTH GB, (19930807), no. 15, pages 1216 - 1218 [XD] 1 *epimerisation of 16 to 15 on page 1217* | [XP] - S.Y. KO ET AL., "The total synthesis of epibatidine", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS, LETCHWORTH GB, (19940817), no. 15 [XP] 1 *conversion of 10 to 1 on page 1775* | [XP] - C. SZANTAY ET AL., "A practical route to epibatidine", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS., OXFORD GB, (19940509), vol. 35, no. 19, doi:doi:10.1016/S0040-4039(00)76859-6, pages 3171 - 3174, XP000575831 [XP] 1-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(00)76859-6 | [AD] - D.F. HUANG ET AL., "A versatile total synthesis of epibatidine and analogs", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS., OXFORD GB, (1993), vol. 34, no. 28, doi:doi:10.1016/0040-4039(93)88063-O, pages 4477 - 4480, XP000575830 [AD] 1-23 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0040-4039(93)88063-O | [AD] - E.J. COREY ET AL., "Stereocontrolled total synthesis of (+)- and (-)-epibatidine", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY., EASTON US, (1993), vol. 58, no. 21, doi:doi:10.1021/jo00073a013, pages 5600 - 5602, XP002001261 [AD] 1-23 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00073a013 |