EP0658724 - Combusiton chamber with ceramic lining [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.04.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.06.1997 [1997/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB PATENT GmbH Kallstadter Strasse 1 68309 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/25] | For all designated states ABB PATENT GmbH Kallstadter Strasse 1 D-68309 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kastner, Johann Hildastrasse 33a D-68775 Ketsch / DE | 02 /
Schulz, Martin, Dr. Hauptstrasse 128 D-67149 Meckenheim / DE | [1995/25] | Representative(s) | Rupprecht, Klaus, et al c/o ABB Patent GmbH Postfach 10 03 51 68128 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/25] | Rupprecht, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al c/o ABB Patent GmbH, Postfach 10 03 51 D-68128 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 94119578.6 | 10.12.1994 | [1995/25] | Priority number, date | DE19934343319 | 18.12.1993 Original published format: DE 4343319 | [1995/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0658724 | Date: | 21.06.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0658724 | Date: | 03.04.1996 | [1996/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F23M5/02, F23R3/00, F27D1/00 | [1995/25] | CPC: |
F27D1/045 (EP);
F23M5/02 (EP);
F23M5/04 (EP);
F23R3/007 (EP);
F27D2001/047 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/25] | Title | German: | Brennkammer mit keramischer Auskleidung | [1995/25] | English: | Combusiton chamber with ceramic lining | [1995/25] | French: | Chambre de combustion avec garniture céramique | [1995/25] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 05.10.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/24] | 22.01.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1997/24] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 13.11.1996 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1996 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4569659 (OLSEN ERIK T ET AL) [X] 1-5,7 * the whole document *; | [X]GB2233079 (WILLIAMSON CLIFF LIMITED) [X] 1-4,6,7 * the whole document *; | [X]US3918255 (HOLDEN ABE N) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]JPS59231313 ; | [A]US3815891 (BLACK W) [A] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850515), vol. 009, no. 111, Database accession no. (M - 379), & JP59231313 A 19841226 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA JUKOGYO KK) [A] 1 * abstract * |