EP0659634 - Suspension device and device for adjusting the track width of a tracked vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.1998 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.03.1998 [1998/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/26] | For all designated states DEERE & COMPANY 1 John Deere Road Moline, Illinois 61265 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nagorcka, James Arthur Glenelg Highway Tarrington 3301, Victoria / AU | 02 /
Kizlyk, Mervin Peter 809 Birdsall Drive Cedar Falls, Iowa 50613 / US | [1995/26] | Representative(s) | Feldmann, Bernhard, et al DEERE & COMPANY European Office Patent Department 68140 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/26] | Feldmann, Bernhard, et al DEERE & COMPANY European Office Patent Department D-68140 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 94119628.9 | 13.12.1994 | [1995/26] | Priority number, date | US19930172693 | 22.12.1993 Original published format: US 172693 | [1995/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0659634 | Date: | 28.06.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0659634 | Date: | 12.03.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B62D55/08, B62D55/084, B62D55/14 | [1995/26] | CPC: |
B62D55/08 (EP,US);
B62D55/084 (EP,US);
B62D55/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1995/26] | Title | German: | Aufhängeeinrichtung und Spurweiteneinstelleinrichtung für ein Raupenfahrzeug | [1995/26] | English: | Suspension device and device for adjusting the track width of a tracked vehicle | [1995/26] | French: | Dispositif de suspension et dispositif pour le réglage de voie d'un véhicule chenillé | [1995/26] | Examination procedure | 27.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/30] | 23.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5018591 (PRICE ROBERT J [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 63 - column 4, line 24; figures 1-6 *; | [A]DE1205844 (BRANDENBURGER TRAKTORENWERKE V) [A] 1 * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 43; figure 3 * |