EP0658357 - Connector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2002 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 05.02.2003 [2003/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Terumo Kabushiki Kaisha No. 44-1, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/25] | For all designated states TERUMO KABUSHIKI KAISHA No. 44-1, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sugahara, Michihiro, c/o Terumo Kabushiki Kaisha 1500, Inokuchi, Nakai-machi Ashigarakami-gun, Kanagawa-ken 259-01 / JP | 02 /
Ishida, Toshinobu, c/o Terumo Kabushiki Kaisha 1500, Inokuchi, Nakai-machi Ashigarakami-gun, Kanagawa-ken 259-01 / JP | [1995/25] | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel, et al Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/25] | Casalonga, Axel, et al BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Morassistrasse 8 D-80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94119989.5 | 16.12.1994 | [1995/25] | Priority number, date | JP19930317109 | 16.12.1993 Original published format: JP 31710993 | [1995/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0658357 | Date: | 21.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0658357 | Date: | 10.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0658357 | Date: | 31.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61M39/06 | [1995/25] | CPC: |
A61M39/0613 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1995/25] | Title | German: | Verbindungselement | [1995/25] | English: | Connector | [1995/25] | French: | Raccord | [1995/25] | Examination procedure | 16.12.1994 | Examination requested [1995/25] | 12.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 27.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 02.05.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 31.10.2001 | SE | 31.01.2002 | [2003/06] |
Former [2002/26] | SE | 31.01.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4252122 (HALVORSEN KENNETH) [X] 11,16 * column 2, line 24 - line 55 * * figure 1 *; | [XA]EP0267584 (CORDIS CORP [US]) [X] 17 * column 5, line 58 - column 6, line 20 * * figure 2A *[A] 4; | [XA]EP0336903 (SCHNEIDER EUROP AG [CH]) [X] 11,14 * column 2, line 17 - line 55 * * figure 2 * [A] 1,5,6; | [XA]US5059186 (YAMAMOTO RONALD K [US], et al) [X] 11,15 * column 8, line 52 - column 10, line 57 * * figures 1,10-12 * [A] 1-3,5,10,12; | [X]US5269764 (VETTER JAMES W [US], et al) [X] 8,9,18 * column 4, line 65 - column 5, line 8 * * column 2 * |