EP0659475 - Processing vessel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.2000 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.04.2000 [2000/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. 9-11, Kitashinagawa 5-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8686 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/26] | For all designated states SUMITOMO HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. 9-11, Kitashinagawa 5-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsugi, Nobuo 1283-2, Miyoshi Toyo-shi / JP | 02 /
Nishimi, Haruyuki 14-38, Kitauchicho-1-chome Niihama-shi / JP | [1995/26] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/26] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94120010.7 | 16.12.1994 | [1995/26] | Priority number, date | JP19930353856 | 27.12.1993 Original published format: JP 35385693 | [1995/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0659475 | Date: | 28.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/26] | Type: | A1 / A2 RE Reissue of A-publication | No.: | EP0659475 | Date: | 10.09.1997 | [1997/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0659475 | Date: | 21.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B01J19/00 | [1995/26] | CPC: |
B01J3/046 (EP,US);
B01J19/20 (KR);
B01J19/0013 (EP,US);
B01J19/24 (EP,US);
B01J3/04 (EP,US);
F28D1/06 (EP,US);
F28D9/0006 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00065 (EP,US);
B01J2219/0009 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00162 (EP,US);
B01J2219/185 (EP,US);
B01J2219/1943 (EP,US);
F28F2250/102 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/26] | Title | German: | Behandlungsbehälter | [1995/26] | English: | Processing vessel | [1995/26] | French: | Récipient de traitement | [1995/26] | Examination procedure | 12.09.1995 | Examination requested [1995/45] | 13.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.10.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]FR1205978 (CIBA GEIGY) [X] 1,2,6-9 * page 2, column R, line 6 - page 4, column L, paragraph 3 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 9; | [A]US3282459 (WILSON CHARLES D) [A] 1,6,8-10 * column W *; | [A]FR2473902 (BEUREL GUY [FR]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2022454 (VYZK USTAV CHEM ZARIZENI) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]US4552724 (MATSUMOTO TADAO [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,5 * column W *; | [A]JPS59180290 ; | [A]JPH01274837 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850219), vol. 9, no. 38, Database accession no. (M - 358), & JP59180290 A 19841013 (MATSUSHITA DENKO K.K.) [A] 2,5 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900126), vol. 14, no. 43, Database accession no. (C - 681), & JP01274837 A 19891102 (HITACHI LTD.) [A] 2,5 * abstract * |