EP0658686 - Engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/25] | Engine and outboard engine structure | ||
[1998/24] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2000 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.04.2000 [2000/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/25] | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minamiaoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koishikawa, Kouji, c/o K K Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | 02 /
Tsunoda, Masaki, c/o K K Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | 03 /
Suzuki, Hitoshi, c/o K K Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | [1995/25] | Representative(s) | Melzer, Wolfgang, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/25] | Melzer, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte, Mitscherlich & Partner, Sonnenstrasse 33 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94120015.6 | 16.12.1994 | [1995/25] | Priority number, date | JP19930343907 | 18.12.1993 Original published format: JP 34390793 | JP19930343908 | 18.12.1993 Original published format: JP 34390893 | JP19930343909 | 18.12.1993 Original published format: JP 34390993 | [1995/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0658686 | Date: | 21.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0658686 | Date: | 14.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F02B75/22, F02B61/04, F02M35/10 | [1995/25] | CPC: |
F02M35/116 (EP,US);
F02B61/045 (EP,US);
F02B75/22 (EP,US);
F02B75/221 (EP,US);
F02M35/167 (EP,US);
F01N2590/021 (EP,US);
F02B2075/027 (EP,US);
F02B2075/1816 (EP,US);
F02B2275/20 (EP,US);
F02F7/006 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, SE [1995/25] | Title | German: | Brennkraftmaschine | [1998/24] | English: | Engine | [1998/24] | French: | Machine à combustion interne | [1998/24] |
Former [1995/25] | Brennkraftmaschine und Aussenbordmotoraufbau | ||
Former [1995/25] | Engine and outboard engine structure | ||
Former [1995/25] | Machine à combustion interne et structure d'un moteur hors-bord | Examination procedure | 21.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/09] | 21.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.10.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 30.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 04.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.01.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.1998 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.05.1998 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 18.08.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/14] | Request for further processing for: | 30.12.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 30.12.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.01.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4787342 (MATSUMORI YOSHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]JPS63143332 ; | [A]US5231958 (TAKAHASHI MASANORI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]JPS6312873 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881024), vol. 12, no. 400, Database accession no. (M - 756), & JP63143332 A 19880615 (HONDA) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880615), vol. 12, no. 208, Database accession no. (M - 709)<3055>, & JP63012873 A 19880120 (SANSHIN IND. CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | Examination | EP0654590 | US4907551 | FR2554166 | US4945887 |