EP0661315 - Extended isocyanurates for use as curing agents in coating compostitions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.03.2000 [2000/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF CORPORATION 26701 Telegraph Road Southfield Michigan 48086-5009 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/27] | For all designated states BASF CORPORATION 26701 Telegraph Road Southfield, Michigan 48086-5009 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohrbom, Walter H. 4915 Sundew Commerce Township, Michigan 48382 / US | 02 /
Menovcik, Gregory G. 26238 Farmington Road Farmington Hills, Michigan 48334 / US | [1995/27] | Representative(s) | Münch, Volker, et al Dres. Fitzner & Münch Rechts- und Patentanwälte Hauser Ring 10 40878 Ratingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/27] | Münch, Volker, Dr., et al BASF Lacke + Farben AG Patente/Lizenzen/Dokumentation Postfach 61 23 D-48136 Münster / DE | Application number, filing date | 94120188.1 | 20.12.1994 | [1995/27] | Priority number, date | US19940176608 | 03.01.1994 Original published format: US 176608 | [1995/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0661315 | Date: | 05.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0661315 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C08G12/40, C09D161/20, C08G18/38, C07D251/34 | [1995/27] | CPC: |
C08K5/34924 (EP);
C07D251/34 (EP);
C08G12/40 (EP);
C08G18/3853 (EP);
C08G18/8077 (EP);
C09D161/20 (EP);
C09D201/025 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1995/27] | Title | German: | Kettenverlängerte Isocyanurate zur Verwendung als Härtungsmittel in Beschichtungszusammensetzungen | [1995/27] | English: | Extended isocyanurates for use as curing agents in coating compostitions | [1995/27] | French: | Isocyanurates à chaîne allongée utilisables comme agent de durcissement dans des compositions de revêtement | [1995/27] | Examination procedure | 08.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/06] | 17.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.06.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0495269 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS) [A] 1 * claim 2 * * page 7, line 43 - page 8, line 30 *; | [A]FR2411182 (CIBA GEIGY AG) [A] 1 * claims 1,9 *; | [PA]US5336566 (REHFUSS JOHN W) [PA] 1 * claims 1,9,13,14 * | Examination | EP0622387 |