EP0659464 - Production of nitrogen using membranes with temperature tracking [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.1999 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2004 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): LU | published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PRAXAIR TECHNOLOGY, INC. 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury, CT 06810-5113 / US | [1995/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Prasad, Ravi 12 Yardly Lane East Amherst, New York / US | [1995/26] | Representative(s) | Schwan, Gerhard Schwan Schwan Schorer Patentanwälte Bauerstrasse 22 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/26] | Schwan, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Elfenstrasse 32 D-81739 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94120217.8 | 20.12.1994 | [1995/26] | Priority number, date | US19930170883 | 21.12.1993 Original published format: US 170883 | [1995/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0659464 | Date: | 28.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0659464 | Date: | 07.05.1997 | [1997/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0659464 | Date: | 26.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/22 | [1995/26] | CPC: |
B01D53/22 (EP,KR,US);
B01D53/226 (EP,US);
B01D2256/10 (KR);
C01B21/0438 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1995/26] | Title | German: | Herstellung von Stickstoff unter Verwendung von Membranen mit Temperaturüberwachung | [1995/26] | English: | Production of nitrogen using membranes with temperature tracking | [1995/26] | French: | Production d'azote utilisant des membranes avec surveillance de la température | [1995/26] | Examination procedure | 20.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/29] | 21.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 30.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 26.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.02.1995 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   06.02.1995 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 26.08.1998 | CH | 26.08.1998 | ES | 26.08.1998 | LI | 26.08.1998 | NL | 26.08.1998 | DK | 26.11.1998 | SE | 26.11.1998 | LU | 20.12.1998 | [2004/38] |
Former [2003/45] | BE | 26.08.1998 | |
CH | 26.08.1998 | ||
ES | 26.08.1998 | ||
LI | 26.08.1998 | ||
NL | 26.08.1998 | ||
DK | 26.11.1998 | ||
SE | 26.11.1998 | ||
LU | 31.12.1998 | ||
Former [2003/08] | BE | 26.08.1998 | |
CH | 26.08.1998 | ||
ES | 26.08.1998 | ||
LI | 26.08.1998 | ||
NL | 26.08.1998 | ||
SE | 26.11.1998 | ||
LU | 31.12.1998 | ||
Former [2002/26] | BE | 26.08.1998 | |
CH | 26.08.1998 | ||
ES | 26.08.1998 | ||
LI | 26.08.1998 | ||
SE | 26.11.1998 | ||
LU | 31.12.1998 | ||
Former [2000/52] | BE | 26.08.1998 | |
CH | 26.08.1998 | ||
LI | 26.08.1998 | ||
SE | 26.11.1998 | ||
LU | 31.12.1998 | ||
Former [2000/50] | BE | 26.08.1998 | |
SE | 26.11.1998 | ||
CH | 01.12.1998 | ||
LI | 01.12.1998 | ||
LU | 31.12.1998 | ||
Former [2000/07] | BE | 26.08.1998 | |
SE | 26.11.1998 | ||
LU | 31.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/32] | BE | 26.08.1998 | |
SE | 26.11.1998 | ||
Former [1999/27] | BE | 26.08.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0517570 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]) [A] 1 * page 1, line 6 - page 1, line 29 * * page 1, line 53 - page 2, line 3 * * page 8, line 55 - page 9, line 6 ** figures 1,2 * |