EP0667497 - Air ventilation arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 15.03.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WIMBÖCK BESITZ GmbH Tiroler Strasse 60 D-83242 Reit im Winkl / DE | [1995/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wimböck, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Tiroler Strasse 60 A D-83242 Reit im Winkl / DE | [1995/33] | Representative(s) | Kohlmann, Karl Friedrich, et al Hoffmann - Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/33] | Kohlmann, Karl Friedrich, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 D-81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94120239.2 | 20.12.1994 | [1995/33] | Priority number, date | DE19934343759 | 21.12.1993 Original published format: DE 4343759 | [1995/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0667497 | Date: | 16.08.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0667497 | Date: | 01.09.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F24F13/06, F24F13/20 | [1995/33] | CPC: |
F24C15/20 (EP);
B08B15/023 (EP);
F24F7/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/33] | Title | German: | Lüftungsanordnung | [1995/33] | English: | Air ventilation arrangement | [1995/33] | French: | Arrangement pour ventilation d'air | [1995/33] | Examination procedure | 22.09.1995 | Examination requested [1995/46] | 28.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.03.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
31.05.2000
WITHDRAWN Rentschler Reven-Lüftungssysteme GmbH Ludwigstrasse 16-18 D-74372 Sersheim / DE Opponent's representative Boehme, Ulrich, et al, et al HOEGER, STELLRECHT & PARTNER Patentanwälte Uhlandstrasse 14 c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/32] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
31.05.2000
WITHDRAWN Rentschler Reven-Lüftungssysteme GmbH Ludwigstrasse 16-18 D-74372 Sersheim / DE Opponent's representative Böhme, Ulrich, Dr. Dipl.-Phys., et al, et al Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | 05.07.2000 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.01.2001 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.11.2001 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 07.12.2001 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2002/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 01.09.1999 | NL | 01.09.1999 | SE | 01.09.1999 | DK | 01.12.1999 | PT | 02.12.1999 | IE | 20.12.1999 | LU | 20.12.1999 | BE | 31.12.1999 | MC | 30.06.2000 | DE | 03.10.2000 | [2007/29] |
Former [2003/45] | GR | 01.09.1999 | |
NL | 01.09.1999 | ||
SE | 01.09.1999 | ||
DK | 01.12.1999 | ||
PT | 02.12.1999 | ||
IE | 20.12.1999 | ||
BE | 31.12.1999 | ||
MC | 30.06.2000 | ||
DE | 03.10.2000 | ||
Former [2003/13] | GR | 01.09.1999 | |
NL | 01.09.1999 | ||
SE | 01.09.1999 | ||
PT | 02.12.1999 | ||
IE | 20.12.1999 | ||
BE | 31.12.1999 | ||
MC | 30.06.2000 | ||
DE | 03.10.2000 | ||
Former [2003/08] | GR | 01.09.1999 | |
NL | 01.09.1999 | ||
PT | 02.12.1999 | ||
IE | 20.12.1999 | ||
BE | 31.12.1999 | ||
MC | 30.06.2000 | ||
DE | 03.10.2000 | ||
Former [2002/13] | GR | 01.09.1999 | |
PT | 02.12.1999 | ||
IE | 20.12.1999 | ||
BE | 31.12.1999 | ||
MC | 30.06.2000 | ||
DE | 03.10.2000 | ||
Former [2001/23] | GR | 01.09.1999 | |
PT | 02.12.1999 | ||
IE | 20.12.1999 | ||
BE | 31.12.1999 | ||
MC | 30.06.2000 | ||
Former [2001/12] | PT | 02.12.1999 | |
IE | 20.12.1999 | ||
BE | 31.12.1999 | ||
Former [2001/08] | PT | 02.12.1999 | |
BE | 31.12.1999 | ||
Former [2000/26] | PT | 02.12.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3190209 (GOETZ DANIEL A) [Y] 1-3,5,6; | [YA]US4088463 (SMITH IRWIN M) [Y] 1-3,5,6 [A] 4; | [YDA]DE2720201 (WIMB¯CK) [YD] 1-3,5,6 [A] 4; | [A]FR2654199 (WESPER SA [FR])[A] 1,2,6; | [Y]GB2261064 (BOOTH MUIRIE LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-3,5,6 | by applicant | US3190209 |